EP4217569 - DRIVE DEVICE FOR PIVOTING A LEAF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states dormakaba Deutschland GmbH Dorma Platz 1 58256 Ennepetal / DE | [2023/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUSCH, Sven 58256 Ennepetal / DE | 02 /
BALK, Thomas 58256 Ennepetal / DE | 03 /
WAGNE, Martin 58256 Ennepetal / DE | 04 /
VOM BROCKE, Jan Eric 58256 Ennepetal / DE | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | Balder IP Law, S.L. Paseo de la Castellana 93 5ª planta 28046 Madrid / ES | [2023/31] | Application number, filing date | 21782544.7 | 24.09.2021 | [2023/31] | WO2021EP76305 | Priority number, date | DE202010125115 | 25.09.2020 Original published format: DE102020125115 | [2023/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022063952 | Date: | 31.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4217569 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E05F1/10, E05F3/22, E05F15/63, H02K7/116, H02K21/24 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
E05F15/63 (EP);
E05F1/105 (EP);
E05F3/224 (EP);
H02K21/24 (EP);
H02K7/116 (EP);
E05F2015/631 (EP);
E05Y2201/434 (EP);
E05Y2201/442 (EP);
E05Y2201/604 (EP);
E05Y2201/71 (EP);
E05Y2800/232 (EP);
E05Y2800/236 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/31] | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSEINRICHTUNG ZUM VERSCHWENKEN EINES FLÜGELS | [2023/31] | English: | DRIVE DEVICE FOR PIVOTING A LEAF | [2023/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAÎNEMENT POUR FAIRE PIVOTER UN BATTANT | [2023/31] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/31] | 31.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4727679 (KORNBREKKE HENNING N [US], et al); | [A]US5193647 (O'BRIEN II JAMES A [US]); | [XI]US6108975 (BAILEY KEVIN L [US]); | [Y]US2009206777 (TAHERI HASSAN [US], et al); | [A]US2010089190 (BUSCH SVEN [DE]); | [XY]DE102015112685 (DORMA DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]); | [Y]WO2019233732 (HEMA MASCHINEN UND APPARATESCHUTZ GMBH [DE], et al) |