EP4205486 - PEAK DATA RATE CALCULATION FOR UPLINK TRANSMIT SWITCHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICO ALVARINO, Alberto San Diego, California 92121 / US | 02 /
GAAL, Peter San Diego, California 92121 / US | 03 /
MANOLAKOS, Alexandros San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2023/27] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [2023/27] | Application number, filing date | 21783624.6 | 25.08.2021 | [2023/27] | WO2021US47594 | Priority number, date | GR20200100514 | 25.08.2020 Original published format: GR 20200100514 | [2023/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022046933 | Date: | 03.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4205486 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/12, H04W28/02, H04W36/00 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
H04W72/1268 (EP,US);
H04L5/0064 (EP,US);
H04W28/0257 (EP);
H04L5/001 (EP);
H04L5/0023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/27] | Title | German: | BERECHNUNG DER SPITZENDATENRATE FÜR UPLINK-ÜBERTRAGUNGSUMSCHALTUNG | [2023/27] | English: | PEAK DATA RATE CALCULATION FOR UPLINK TRANSMIT SWITCHING | [2023/27] | French: | CALCUL DU DÉBIT DE DONNÉES DE POINTE POUR COMMUTATION DE TRANSMISSION EN LIAISON MONTANTE | [2023/27] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/27] | 22.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2538718 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [A] 1-30 * abstract * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0023] * * claims 1-10 ** figures 1-16 *; | [I]US2017303182 (UCHINO TOORU [JP], et al) [I] 1-30 * abstract * * figures 1-19 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0011] , [0012] , [0061] , [0062] * * claims 1-20 * |