EP4133555 - A CONNECTOR UNIT FOR A CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TVS Motor Company Limited Chaitanya, No.12 Khader Nawaz Khan Road Nungambakkam 600006 Chennai / IN | [2023/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMAR DEEP, Kumar TVS Motor Company Limited, Chaitanya No.12 Khader Nawaz Khan Road, Nungambakkam Chennai, 600 006 / IN | 02 /
DIPANJAN, Mazumdar TVS Motor Company Limited, Chaitanya No.12 Khader Nawaz Khan Road, Nungambakkam Chennai, 600 006 / IN | 03 /
RAMYA, Ganesan TVS Motor Company Limited, Chaitanya No.12 Khader Nawaz Khan Road, Nungambakkam Chennai, 600 006 / IN | 04 /
SARAVANAN, Gangalakshmi TVS Motor Company Limited, Chaitanya No.12 Khader Nawaz Khan Road, Nungambakkam Chennai, 600 006 / IN | [2023/07] | Representative(s) | Patentanwaltskanzlei Matschnig & Forsthuber OG Biberstraße 22 Postfach 36 1010 Wien / AT | [2023/07] | Application number, filing date | 21783896.0 | 10.04.2021 | [2023/07] | WO2021IN50358 | Priority number, date | IN202041015752 | 11.04.2020 Original published format: IN202041015752 | [2023/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021205480 | Date: | 14.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4133555 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IN | 14.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01R9/22, B60R16/02, // H01R4/18, H01R11/12, B60R16/023 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
H01R9/223 (EP);
B60R16/0207 (EP);
B60R16/0238 (EP);
H01R11/12 (EP);
H01R2107/00 (EP);
H01R2201/26 (EP);
H01R4/185 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/07] | H01R9/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSEINHEIT FÜR EIN STEUERGERÄT | [2023/07] | English: | A CONNECTOR UNIT FOR A CONTROL DEVICE | [2023/07] | French: | UNITÉ DE CONNECTEUR POUR DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE | [2023/07] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 05.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/07] | 05.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH1154166 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS); | [I]US9166312 (BAKATSIAS KOSTAS [GR], et al); | [X]US9882294 (JEONG MYUNGKYU [KR], et al); | [XI]US10084248 (BOISNIER BENJAMIN [FR], et al); | [X]US10158184 (BOISNIER BENJAMIN [FR], et al) | International search | [XY]EP2727772 (YAZAKI CORP [JP]); | [Y]CN106602387B |