EP4132404 - DEVICES AND METHODS FOR REDUCING PARASYMPATHETIC NERVE ACTIVITY IN PATIENTS WITH A RESPIRATORY SYNDROME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sonivie Ltd. 26 Ha-Rav Shalom Shabazi Street 4802126 Rosh Haayin / IL | [2023/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARIGNAN, Charles S. 140 Shawmut Ave Boston, MA 02118 / US | 02 /
SHABTAY, Or 2011000 Kibbutz Farod / IL | 03 /
ROSENSTEIN, Maya 45 Rashi Street 7530878 Rishon Le-Zion / IL | 04 /
SHAV, Dalit 292 Cornwall Rd. Glen Rock, New Jersey 07452 / US | 05 /
COHEN KEIZMAN, Talia 18 HaRashba Street 7548309 Rishon LeZion / IL | 06 /
NAOR, Daniel 4/4 HaTivat Alexandroni Street 7172118 Modi'in / IL | 07 /
ADMON, Ofek 43 Abba Hillel Street 5253216 Ramat-Gan / IL | [2023/07] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Bauer Vorberg Kayser Partnerschaft mbB Goltsteinstraße 87 50968 Köln / DE | [2023/07] | Application number, filing date | 21784208.7 | 07.04.2021 | [2023/07] | WO2021IL50396 | Priority number, date | US202063006196P | 07.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063006196 P | US202016936443 | 23.07.2020 Original published format: US202016936443 | [2023/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021205450 | Date: | 14.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4132404 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14, A61N7/02, A61N7/00, // A61B18/00, A61B18/02, A61B90/00, A61M16/04 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
A61B18/1492 (EP);
A61B18/14 (US);
A61B18/02 (EP);
A61M16/0463 (US);
A61N7/00 (EP);
A61N7/02 (EP);
A61N7/022 (EP);
A61B2018/00005 (US);
A61B2018/00011 (EP);
A61B2018/00214 (EP);
A61B2018/0022 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00255 (EP);
A61B2018/00273 (EP);
A61B2018/00279 (EP);
A61B2018/00375 (EP);
A61B2018/00434 (EP);
A61B2018/00541 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00577 (EP);
A61B2018/00642 (EP);
A61B2018/00714 (EP);
A61B2018/00791 (EP);
A61B2018/00994 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0212 (EP);
A61B2018/1467 (US);
A61B2090/064 (EP);
A61B2218/002 (EP);
A61B2218/007 (EP);
A61M16/0488 (EP);
A61N2007/0004 (EP);
A61N2007/0021 (EP);
A61N2007/0026 (EP);
A61N2007/003 (EP);
A61N2007/0047 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/07] | A61B18/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERRINGERUNG DER PARASYMPATHISCHEN NERVENAKTIVITÄT BEI PATIENTEN MIT EINEM ATEMWEGSSYNDROM | [2023/07] | English: | DEVICES AND METHODS FOR REDUCING PARASYMPATHETIC NERVE ACTIVITY IN PATIENTS WITH A RESPIRATORY SYNDROME | [2023/07] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ET MÉTHODES DE RÉDUCTION DE L'ACTIVITÉ NERVEUSE PARASYMPATHIQUE CHEZ DES PATIENTS ATTEINTS D'UN SYNDROME RESPIRATOIRE | [2023/07] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014005706 (GELFAND MARK [US], et al); | [A]US2015112234 (MCCAFFREY GERRY [IE], et al); | [XI]US2016220851 (MAYSE MARTIN L [US], et al); | [XI]US2016287912 (WARNKING REINHARD J [US]) | International search | [Y]WO2009137446 (PLUROMED INC [US], et al) [Y] 8 * entire document *; | [XY]US2009306644 (MAYSE MARTIN L [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,9,11,13-15,17, 22 * entire document * [Y] 3, 8, 10, 16, 18, 20, 21, 46, 47; | [XY]US2011301587 (DEEM MARK [US], et al) [X] 40-43 * entire document * [Y] 20; | [Y]US2013324989 (LEUNG MARK [CA], et al) [Y] 10 * entire document *; | [A]US2015141985 (MAYSE MARTIN L [US], et al) [A] 1-50* entire document *; | [Y]US2016220851 (MAYSE MARTIN L [US], et al) [Y] 32-34, 37, 39 * entire document *; | [Y]US2016287912 (WARNKING REINHARD J [US]) [Y] 18, 21, 32-34, 37, 39, 46,47 * entire document *; | [A]US2016310210 (HARSHMAN SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 1-50 * entire document *; | [X]US2018345046 (GALLUP DAVID A [US]) [X] 45 * entire document *; | [Y]US2019201089 (WALDSTREICHER JONATHAN REUBEN [US], et al) [Y] 3, 16 * entire document * |