EP4024130 - SHOE DEVICE, ACCESSORY, ACCESSORY SHOE DEVICE, AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 17.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 SHIMOMARUKO 3-CHOME OHTA-KU Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKANO, Yoshinobu c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 02 /
ISHII, Kenji c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 21784526.2 | 02.04.2021 | [2022/27] | WO2021JP14319 | Priority number, date | JP20200070625 | 09.04.2020 Original published format: JP 2020070625 | JP20200148939 | 04.09.2020 Original published format: JP 2020148939 | [2022/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021206018 | Date: | 14.10.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4024130 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G03B17/56, G03B15/05, H01R24/62, H01R13/631 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
H01R13/631 (EP,US);
G03B17/566 (EP,KR,US);
G03B15/05 (EP,CN);
G03B15/02 (US);
G03B15/03 (KR);
H01R13/40 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2022/27] | G03B17/56, G03B15/03, G03B15/05, H04N5/225 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Title | German: | SCHUHVORRICHTUNG, ZUBEHÖR, ZUBEHÖRSCHUHVORRICHTUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2022/27] | English: | SHOE DEVICE, ACCESSORY, ACCESSORY SHOE DEVICE, AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS | [2022/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SABOT, ACCESSOIRE, DISPOSITIF DE SABOT PORTE-ACCESSOIRE ET APPAREIL ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2021 | Translation filed | 29.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 14.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 17.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005237426 (TAKASHIMA KOUICHIRO [JP], et al); | [X]US8314882 (TAKANO HIRONORI [JP]); | [X]US2013010185 (MOTOKI YASUYUKI [JP], et al); | [X]US10571778 (FUJIMURA YUICHI [JP]) | International search | [XA]JP2006079053 (SONY CORP); | [XA]JP2018084681 (CANON KK) | by applicant | JP2018084681 |