EP4133940 - AGROCHEMICAL-CONTAINING PRESSURE-SENSITIVE ADHESIVE TAPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nichiban Co., Ltd. 3-3, Sekiguchi 2-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-8663 / JP | For all designated states Wakayama, Kenji c/o Wakayama Professional Engineer Office 26-15, Narashinodai 1-chome Funabashi-shi, Chiba 274-0063 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2023/07] | For all designated states Nichiban Co., Ltd. 3-3, Sekiguchi 2-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-8663 / JP | ||
For all designated states Wakayama, Kenji c/o Wakayama Professional Engineer Office 26-15, Narashinodai 1-chome Funabashi-shi, Chiba 274-0063 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HATTORI Rie c/o Nichiban Co.,Ltd., 3-3, Sekiguchi 2-chome, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-8663 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIZUMI Kazuhiko c/o Nichiban Co.,Ltd., 3-3, Sekiguch 2-chome, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-8663 / JP | 03 /
KONO Kazuhiro c/o Nichiban Co.,Ltd., 3-3, Sekiguch 2-chome, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-8663 / JP | 04 /
DOI Takahiro c/o Nichiban Co.,Ltd., 3-3, Sekiguch 2-chome, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-8663 / JP | 05 /
TAKAICHI Chihiro c/o Nichiban Co.,Ltd., 3-3, Sekiguch 2-chome, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-8663 / JP | 06 /
WAKAYAMA Kenji c/o Wakayama Professional Engineer office, 26-15 Narashinodai 1-chome Funabashi-shi, Chiba 274-0063 / JP | [2023/07] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/07] | Beckmann, Claus Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21784857.1 | 02.04.2021 | [2023/07] | WO2021JP14334 | Priority number, date | JP20200068514 | 06.04.2020 Original published format: JP 2020068514 | [2023/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021206021 | Date: | 14.10.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4133940 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A01P13/00, A01N43/50, A01N25/24, A01N25/34 | [2023/07] | CPC: |
A01N25/34 (EP,KR);
A01N25/24 (KR);
C09J7/385 (US);
A01N25/10 (EP);
A01N33/18 (US);
A01N43/50 (KR);
A01P13/00 (EP,KR);
A01P7/04 (EP);
C09J107/02 (US);
| C-Set: |
A01N25/10, A01N43/50, A01N51/00, A01N57/20 (EP);
A01N25/34, A01N43/50, A01N51/00, A01N57/20 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] | Title | German: | AGROCHEMISCHES HAFTKLEBEBAND | [2023/07] | English: | AGROCHEMICAL-CONTAINING PRESSURE-SENSITIVE ADHESIVE TAPE | [2023/07] | French: | BANDE ADHÉSIVE SENSIBLE À LA PRESSION CONTENANT UN PRODUIT AGROCHIMIQUE | [2023/07] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2022 | Translation filed | 25.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/07] | 19.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS4966U ; | [Y]JPS6251603 (HISAMITSU PHARMACEUTICAL CO, et al); | [X]JPH01153601 (UNIE KOGYO KK); | [Y]US5201925 (ITZEL HANSHELMUT [US], et al); | [Y]CA1334930 (SHELL AGRAR GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [X]JP2001048710 (HAYASE MANABU); | [A]US9226496 (XU CHANGQING [CN], et al) | International search | [Y]JPS5899402 (ITO SUSUMU); | [Y]JPS6333301 (CELAMERCK GMBH & CO KG); | [Y]JPS6351301 (HISAMITSU PHARMACEUTICAL CO, et al); | [A]JPH06312903 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) |