EP4116027 - LASER PROCESSING DEVICE WITH A MONITORING DEVICE, AND LASER PROCESSING MONITORING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2023/02] | LASER PROCESSING MONITORING DEVICE, LASER PROCESSING MONITORING METHOD, AND LASER PROCESSING DEVICE | ||
[2024/15] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amada Weld Tech Co., Ltd. 200, Ishida Isehara-shi Kanagawa 259-1196 / JP | For all designated states Amada Co., Ltd. 200, Ishida Isehara-shi, Kanagawa 259-1196 / JP | [2023/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANASE, Atsushi 200, Ishida Isehara-shi, Kanagawa 259-1196 / JP | 02 /
NISHIZAKI, Yusuke 200, Ishida Isehara-shi, Kanagawa 259-1196 / JP | [2023/02] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/02] | Application number, filing date | 21784982.7 | 04.03.2021 | [2023/02] | WO2021JP08475 | Priority number, date | JP20200068853 | 07.04.2020 Original published format: JP 2020068853 | [2023/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021205789 | Date: | 14.10.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4116027 | Date: | 11.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4116027 | Date: | 14.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/03, B23K26/21, B23K31/12 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
B23K26/032 (EP);
B23K26/705 (US);
B23K26/0643 (US);
B23K26/21 (EP,US);
B23K31/125 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/02] | B23K26/00, B23K26/064 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LASERBEARBEITUNGVORRICHTUNG MIT EINER ÜBERWACHUNGSVORRICHTUNG, UND LASERBEARBEITUNGSÜBERWACHUNGSVERFAHREN | [2024/15] | English: | LASER PROCESSING DEVICE WITH A MONITORING DEVICE, AND LASER PROCESSING MONITORING METHOD | [2024/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT LASER AVEC UN DISPOSITIF DE SURVEILLANCE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE SURVEILLANCE DE TRAITEMENT LASER | [2024/15] |
Former [2023/02] | LASERVERARBEITUNGSÜBERWACHUNGSVORRICHTUNG, LASERVERARBEITUNGSÜBERWACHUNGSVERFAHREN UND LASERVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2023/02] | LASER PROCESSING MONITORING DEVICE, LASER PROCESSING MONITORING METHOD, AND LASER PROCESSING DEVICE | ||
Former [2023/02] | DISPOSITIF DE SURVEILLANCE DE TRAITEMENT LASER, PROCÉDÉ DE SURVEILLANCE DE TRAITEMENT LASER ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT LASER | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2022 | Translation filed | 05.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 05.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/02] | 03.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2011031410 (TANAAMI TAKEO [JP], et al); | [Y]US2014346150 (HESSE TIM [DE], et al); | [Y]CN110231610 (UNIV WUHAN) | International search | [A]JPH11197863 (NIKON CORP); | [A]JP2004132793 (NUCLEAR FUEL IND LTD, et al); | [A]JP2005254314 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JP2007030032 (MIYACHI TECHNOS KK); | [A]JP2014015352 (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP) | by applicant | JP2007030032 | JP2020068853 |