EP4095667 - DATA MANAGEMENT APPARATUS, DATA MANAGEMENT METHOD, AND DATA STORAGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Xiaoming Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2022/48] | Application number, filing date | 21785433.0 | 17.03.2021 | [2022/48] | WO2021CN81210 | Priority number, date | CN202010271256 | 08.04.2020 Original published format: CN202010271256 | CN202010718684 | 23.07.2020 Original published format: CN202010718684 | [2022/48] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021203927 | Date: | 14.10.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4095667 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/06 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
G06F3/0649 (EP);
G06F3/0604 (CN);
G06F3/0613 (US);
G06F3/061 (EP);
G06F3/0647 (CN,US);
G06F3/0658 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Title | German: | DATENVERWALTUNGSVORRICHTUNG, DATENVERWALTUNGSVERFAHREN UND DATENSPEICHERVORRICHTUNG | [2022/48] | English: | DATA MANAGEMENT APPARATUS, DATA MANAGEMENT METHOD, AND DATA STORAGE DEVICE | [2022/48] | French: | APPAREIL DE GESTION DE DONNÉES, PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DE DONNÉES ET DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE DE DONNÉES | [2022/48] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2022 | Translation filed | 25.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 13.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008114924 (FRAYER JACK EDWARD [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 4-5 * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0040] *; | [A]US2010199036 (SIEWERT SAMUEL BURK [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-10 ** paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0081] *; | [X]EP2963554 (INTEL CORP [US]) [X] 1-15 * figures 1-2 * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0027] * | International search | [X]CN101398745 (PHISON ELECTRONICS CORP [CN]) [X] 1-26 * description pages 1-14, figures 3-6C *; | [A]CN106484325 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD) [A] 1-26 * entire document *; | [A]CN109359069 (JINAN INSPUR HI TECH INVEST & DEVELOPMENT CO LTD) [A] 1-26* entire document * |