EP4055115 - LIGHT EMITTING COMPONENT AND LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.04.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avantama AG Laubisrütistrasse 50 8712 Stäfa / CH | [2022/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LÜCHINGER, Norman, Albert 8712 Stäfa / CH | [2022/37] | Representative(s) | E. Blum & Co. AG Franklinturm Hofwiesenstrasse 349 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2022/37] | E. Blum & Co. AG Patent- und Markenanwälte VSP Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 21785899.2 | 01.10.2021 | [2022/37] | WO2021EP77056 | Priority number, date | EP20200200906 | 08.10.2020 Original published format: EP 20200906 | [2022/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022073859 | Date: | 14.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4055115 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4055115 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/02, C09K11/56, C09K11/66, C09K11/70, C09K11/88, H05B33/14, H05B33/20, G02F1/1335, H01L25/075, H01L25/16, H01L33/50, C07F7/21, C07F7/24 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
C09K11/664 (EP,KR);
H01L33/502 (EP,KR);
G02F1/133614 (EP,KR,US);
C07F7/21 (EP);
C07F7/24 (EP);
C09K11/02 (EP,KR,US);
C09K11/025 (EP);
C09K11/06 (US);
C09K11/565 (EP,KR);
C09K11/70 (EP,KR);
C09K11/883 (EP,KR);
G02F1/133603 (US);
G02F1/133606 (US);
G02F1/133608 (US);
H01L25/0753 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2022/37] | C09K11/02, C07F7/21, C07F7/24, C09K11/56, C09K11/66, C09K11/70, C09K11/88, H05B33/14, H05B33/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LICHTEMITTIERENDE KOMPONENTE UND LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG | [2022/37] | English: | LIGHT EMITTING COMPONENT AND LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE | [2022/37] | French: | COMPOSANT ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT | [2022/37] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/37] | 10.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 28.06.2023 | ES | 28.06.2023 | HR | 28.06.2023 | MC | 28.06.2023 | PL | 28.06.2023 | RO | 28.06.2023 | RS | 28.06.2023 | SK | 28.06.2023 | SM | 28.06.2023 | NO | 28.09.2023 | GR | 29.09.2023 | IS | 28.10.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 28.06.2023 | |
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 28.06.2023 | |
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | NO | 28.09.2023 | |
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | NO | 28.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2017186922 (KIM TAE HYUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * example 1 * * the whole document *; | [A]WO2017108568 (AVANTAMA AG [CH]) [A] 1-15 * example 3 * * claim 1 * * the whole document *; | [A]WO2017195062 (UNIV KING ABDULLAH SCI & TECH [SA]) [A] 1-15 * example 2 * * the whole document *; | [A]WO2018146561 (UNIV KING ABDULLAH SCI & TECH [SA]) [A] 1-15 * example 3 * * the whole document *; | [A]WO2020130592 (SEOUL NAT UNIV R&DB FOUNDATION [KR]) [A] 1-15 * example 1 ** the whole document * | by applicant | US2017186922 | WO2017108568 | WO2017195062 | WO2018028869 | WO2018146561 | WO2020130592 |