EP4204082 - ION BEAM PATHS ON TARGET SURFACES FOR NEUTRON BEAM GENERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAE Technologies, Inc. 19631 Pauling Foothill Ranch, CA 92610 / US | [2023/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SNITCHLER, Gregory Luke Foothill Ranch, California 92610 / US | 02 /
ZIAEI, Shahyar Ladera Ranch, California 92694 / US | 03 /
EGGERS, Harrison Beam Pendleton, South Carolina 29670 / US | 04 /
DAME, Alejandro Mesa Eden Prairie, Minnesota 55346 / US | [2023/27] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/27] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 21786042.8 | 26.08.2021 | [2023/27] | WO2021US47777 | Priority number, date | US202063070789P | 26.08.2020 Original published format: US 202063070789 P | [2023/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2022047050 | Date: | 03.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4204082 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/10, H05H3/06 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
A61N5/1075 (EP,KR);
H05H7/001 (EP,KR,US);
A61N5/10 (US);
A61N5/1067 (KR);
A61N5/1077 (KR);
H05H6/00 (US);
A61N2005/109 (EP,KR,US);
H05H2007/002 (EP,KR,US);
H05H2007/008 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/27] | Title | German: | IONENSTRAHLWEGE AUF ZIELOBERFLÄCHEN ZUR NEUTRONENSTRAHLERZEUGUNG | [2023/27] | English: | ION BEAM PATHS ON TARGET SURFACES FOR NEUTRON BEAM GENERATION | [2023/27] | French: | TRAJETS D'UN FAISCEAU D'IONS SUR DES SURFACES CIBLES POUR LA GÉNÉRATION D'UN FAISCEAU DE NEUTRONS | [2023/27] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/27] | 04.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees SM, NL, BG, BE, AT, AL, TR, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH | 04.04.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 04.04.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.04.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 04.04.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 04.04.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.04.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 04.04.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 04.04.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.04.2023 | Decision despatched | 04.04.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 04.04.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.04.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4995102 (ICHINOSE YUUJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-10,28-40,52,58,59 * column 3, line 16 - line 41; figures 1-5 *; | [XYI]US2006027544 (PAILTHORP ROBERT M [US], et al) [X] 1-10,28-40,52,58,59 * paragraphs [0072] - [0076]; figures 6,7; claim 1 * [Y] 19-21,26,27,49-51,56,57 [I] 23-25,53-55; | [A]EP1895819 (ION BEAM APPLIC SA [BE]) [A] 1-59,90-93* paragraphs [0019] - [0022] *; | [X]US2010109680 (ADAMS CHRISTOPHER P [US], et al) [X] 1-10,28-40,52,58,59,90-93 * figures 1,16B *; | [X]US2013211390 (BOR ZSOLT [US], et al) [X] 1-10,28-40,52,58,59,90-93 * figures 1,8 *; | [A]KR20180060465 (DAWONSYS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-59,90-93 * paragraphs [0001] - [0009] *; | [Y]JP2018201774 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES) [Y] 19-21,26,27,49-51,56,57 * abstract *; | [A]EP3637437 (KANEKA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-59,90-93 * paragraphs [0001] , [0010] , [0011] , [0013] * |