EP4189501 - METHOD FOR OFFLINE AND / OR ONLINE IDENTIFICATION OF A STATE OF A MACHINE TOOL, AT LEAST ONE OF ITS TOOLS OR AT LEAST ONE WORKPIECE MACHINED THEREIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2023/23] | METHOD FOR THE OFFLINE AND/OR ONLINE IDENTIFICATION OF A STATE OF A MACHINE TOOL, AT LEAST ONE OF ITS TOOLS OR AT LEAST ONE WORKPIECE MACHINED THEREIN | ||
[2024/11] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.04.2024 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2023/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNAPPE, Dominik 59077 Hamm / DE | 02 /
WASCHEW, Arthur 52074 Aachen / DE | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2023/23] | Application number, filing date | 21786773.8 | 22.09.2021 | [2023/23] | WO2021EP76019 | Priority number, date | EP20200198969 | 29.09.2020 Original published format: EP 20198969 | [2023/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022069308 | Date: | 07.04.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4189501 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/4065, B23Q17/00, B23Q17/09 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
G05B19/4065 (EP);
G05B19/416 (US);
B23Q17/007 (EP);
B23Q17/0961 (EP,US);
B23Q17/0976 (EP,US);
B23Q17/0995 (US);
G05B2219/37229 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/23] | G05B19/4065, B23Q17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR OFFLINE UND/ODER ONLINE IDENTIFIKATION EINES ZUSTANDES EINER WERKZEUGMASCHINE, ZUMINDEST EINES IHRER WERKZEUGE ODER ZUMINDEST EINES DARIN BEARBEITETEN WERKSTÜCKS | [2023/23] | English: | METHOD FOR OFFLINE AND / OR ONLINE IDENTIFICATION OF A STATE OF A MACHINE TOOL, AT LEAST ONE OF ITS TOOLS OR AT LEAST ONE WORKPIECE MACHINED THEREIN | [2024/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'IDENTIFICATION HORS LIGNE ET/OU EN LIGNE D'UN ÉTAT D'UNE MACHINE-OUTIL, D'AU MOINS UN DE SES OUTILS OU D'AU MOINS UNE PIÈCE USINÉE PAR CELLE-CI | [2024/11] |
Former [2023/23] | METHOD FOR THE OFFLINE AND/OR ONLINE IDENTIFICATION OF A STATE OF A MACHINE TOOL, AT LEAST ONE OF ITS TOOLS OR AT LEAST ONE WORKPIECE MACHINED THEREIN | ||
Former [2023/23] | PROCÉDÉ POUR L'IDENTIFICATION HORS LIGNE ET/OU EN LIGNE D'UN ÉTAT D'UNE MACHINE-OUTIL, D'AU MOINS L'UN DE SES OUTILS OU D'AU MOINS UNE PIÈCE USINÉE À L'INTÉRIEUR DE CELLE-CI | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 01.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2006037137 (KEBA AG [AT], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102007048961 (DAIMLER AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP3614220 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [AD] 1-13* the whole document *; | [X] - ZHU LIDA ET AL, "Recent progress of chatter prediction, detection and suppression in milling", MECHANICAL SYSTEMS AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 143, doi:10.1016/J.YMSSP.2020.106840, ISSN 0888-3270, (20200331), (20200331), XP086151299 [X] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymssp.2020.106840 | [X] - GUILLEM QUINTANA ET AL, "Using kernel data in machine tools for the indirect evaluation of surface roughness in vertical milling operations", ROBOTICS AND COMPUTER INTEGRATED MANUFACTURING, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, vol. 27, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.RCIM.2011.05.005, ISSN 0736-5845, (20110524), pages 1011 - 1018, (20110531), XP028234861 [X] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.rcim.2011.05.005 | by applicant | WO2020038815 |