EP4137617 - SILICON SINGLE CRYSTAL SUBSTRATE FOR VAPOR DEPOSITION, VAPOR DEPOSITION SUBSTRATE, AND MANUFACTURING METHODS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd. 2-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [2023/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUCHIYA, Keitaro c/o Isobe R&D Center, Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd. 13-1, Isobe 2-chome Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0196 / JP | 02 /
SHINOMIYA, Masaru c/o Isobe R&D Center, Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd. 13-1, Isobe 2-chome Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0196 / JP | 03 /
QU, Weifeng c/o Isobe R&D Center, Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd. 13-1, Isobe 2-chome Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0196 / JP | [2023/08] | Representative(s) | Sonnenhauser, Thomas Martin Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/08] | Sonnenhauser, Thomas Martin Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21787666.3 | 23.03.2021 | [2023/08] | WO2021JP11845 | Priority number, date | JP20200073795 | 17.04.2020 Original published format: JP 2020073795 | [2023/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021210354 | Date: | 21.10.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4137617 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C30B29/06, C23C16/30, C30B13/00, C30B25/18, C30B33/02, C30B29/40 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
C23C16/303 (EP);
C30B33/02 (EP,US);
C30B13/00 (EP,US);
C30B25/183 (EP);
C30B25/186 (US);
C30B29/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/08] | C30B29/06, C23C16/34, C30B13/00, C30B25/18, C30B29/38, C30B33/02, C30B33/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/08] | Title | German: | SILICIUMEINKRISTALLSUBSTRAT ZUR DAMPFABSCHEIDUNG, DAMPFABSCHEIDUNGSSUBSTRAT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2023/08] | English: | SILICON SINGLE CRYSTAL SUBSTRATE FOR VAPOR DEPOSITION, VAPOR DEPOSITION SUBSTRATE, AND MANUFACTURING METHODS THEREFOR | [2023/08] | French: | SUBSTRAT MONOCRISTALLIN DE SILICIUM POUR LE DÉPÔT EN PHASE VAPEUR, SUBSTRAT DE DÉPÔT EN PHASE VAPEUR ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ASSOCIÉS | [2023/08] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2022 | Translation filed | 13.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2005010243 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK [JP], et al); | [A]JP2007176725 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK); | International search | [A]WO2005010243 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK [JP], et al); | [A]JP2016111044 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK) | by applicant | JP2012079952 |