EP4117110 - FILTER STRUCTURE AND FILTER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Anhui Anuki Technologies Co., Ltd. Rm. 602 Floor 6 Block C Bldg. J1 Hefei Innovation Industrial Park Phase II 2800 Chuangxin Ave. High-Tech Industrial Development Zone Hefei, Anhui 230088 / CN | [2023/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIU, Jian Rm 602, Floor 6, Block C, Bldg J1 Hefei Innovation Industrial Park Phase II 2800 Chuangxin Ave High-Tech Industrial Development Zone Hefei, Anhui 230088 / CN | 02 /
ZUO, Chengjie Rm 602, Floor 6, Block C, Bldg J1 Hefei Innovation Industrial Park Phase II 2800 Chuangxin Ave High-Tech Industrial Development Zone Hefei, Anhui 230088 / CN | 03 /
HE, Jun Rm 602, Floor 6, Block C, Bldg J1 Hefei Innovation Industrial Park Phase II 2800 Chuangxin Ave High-Tech Industrial Development Zone Hefei, Anhui 230088 / CN | [2023/02] | Representative(s) | Pietri, Simona Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Corso dei Tintori, 25 50122 Firenze / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2023/02] | Papa, Elisabetta, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A Piazza di Pietra, 39 00186 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 21787857.8 | 02.04.2021 | [2023/02] | WO2021CN85213 | Priority number, date | CN202010306011 | 17.04.2020 Original published format: CN202010306011 | [2023/02] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021208761 | Date: | 21.10.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4117110 | Date: | 11.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01P1/20, H01P1/208 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
H01P1/2053 (EP);
H01P1/208 (CN,KR);
H01P1/20 (CN);
H01P1/207 (US);
H01P7/06 (US)
|
Former IPC [2023/02] | H01P1/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/02] | Title | German: | FILTERSTRUKTUR UND FILTERVORRICHTUNG | [2023/02] | English: | FILTER STRUCTURE AND FILTER DEVICE | [2023/02] | French: | STRUCTURE DE FILTRE ET DISPOSITIF DE FILTRE | [2023/02] | Entry into regional phase | 03.10.2022 | Translation filed | 03.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 03.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 03.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 03.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/02] | 08.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3516030 (BRUMBELOW JOSEPH S) [X] 1-3,9,12-15 * the whole document * [A] 11; | [X]CN101276952 (UNIV SOUTH CHINA TECH [CN]) [X] 1-3,9,12-15 * abstract *; | [A]CN103378388 (NANJING SAIGEW MICROWAVE SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [XAI]US2017346148 (TAMIAZZO STEFANO [IT], et al) [X] 1-3,9,10,12-15 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0033]; figures 3,4 * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0042]; figures 6-8 * [A] 11 [I] 4,6-8; | [XAI]US2018277918 (KIM JOUNG-HOE [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,5,9,10,12-15 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0068]; figures 3A-9 * [A] 11 [I] 4,6-8; | [A]US2018301781 (PENG JIE [CN], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0060]; figure 4 * | International search | [X]CN107359394 (ROSENBERGER TECH KUNSHAN CO LTD) [X] 1-15 * description, paragraphs [0029]-[0041], and figure 1 *; | [A]US2018131063 (ZHU LI [CA], et al) [A] 1-15* entire document *; | [PX]CN111403868 (ANHUI ANNUQI TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-15 * description, paragraphs [0044]-[0083] * |