EP4135565 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CLASSIFYING CRITICAL HEART DEFECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | [2023/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIEFKES, Heather c/o UC Davis Innovation Access 1850 Research Park Drive Suite 100 Davis, California 95618 / US | 02 /
LAKSHMINRUSIMHA, Satyanarayana c/o UC Davis Innovation Access 1850 Research Park Drive Suite 100 Davis, California 95618 / US | 03 /
CHUAH, Chen-Nee c/o UC Davis Innovation Access 1850 Research Park Drive Suite 100 Davis, California 95618 / US | 04 /
LAI, Zhengfeng c/o UC Davis Innovation Access 1850 Research Park Drive Suite 100 Davis, California 95618 / US | [2023/08] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/08] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | Application number, filing date | 21788197.8 | 16.04.2021 | [2023/08] | WO2021US27837 | Priority number, date | US202063011998P | 17.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063011998 P | [2023/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021212082 | Date: | 21.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4135565 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [2023/08] | CPC: |
A61B5/14551 (EP,US);
A61B5/0205 (US);
A61B5/02405 (EP);
A61B5/02416 (EP,US);
A61B5/026 (US);
A61B5/681 (US);
A61B5/7267 (EP,US);
A61B5/7275 (US);
G06N20/10 (US);
G06N20/20 (US);
G16H50/20 (US);
A61B2503/045 (EP,US);
A61B5/02007 (EP);
A61B5/02014 (EP);
A61B5/02028 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/08] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR KLASSIFIZIERUNG KRITISCHER HERZDEFEKTE | [2023/08] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CLASSIFYING CRITICAL HEART DEFECTS | [2023/08] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE CLASSIFICATION DE MALFORMATIONS CARDIAQUES CRITIQUES | [2023/08] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/08] | 23.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2019274635 (AL-ALI AMMAR [US], et al) [Y] 1-3, 29-31, 37-39, 41-46, 50-53, 59-60 * entire document especially Abstract, para [0002]-[0003], para [0013]-[0019], para [0037]-[0046], para [0075]-[0084] *; | [Y]US2019392951 (JAIN SIDDHARTH [US], et al) [Y] 1-3, 29-31, 37-39, 41-46,50-53, 59-60 * entire document especially Abstract, para [0075], para [0175]-[0185], para [0193]-[0195] *; | [A]US2020077951 (NALLATHAMBI GABRIEL [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 29-31, 37-39, 41-46,50-53, 59-60* entire document * |