EP4136759 - AIMABLE BEAM ANTENNA SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | 29.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | 29.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pivotal Commware, Inc. 22215 26th Avenue SE 100 Bothell, WA 98021 / US | [2024/07] |
Former [2023/08] | For all designated states Pivotal Commware, Inc. 10801 120th Avenue NE 200 Kirkland, WA 98033 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASON, Timothy, Hudson 10801 120th Avenue NE 200 Kirkland, WA 98033 / US | 02 /
SIVAPRAKASAM, Srinivas 10801 120th Avenue NE 200 Kirkland, WA 98033 / US | [2023/08] | Representative(s) | K2 IP Limited c/o Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [2023/08] | Application number, filing date | 21788290.1 | 08.04.2021 | [2023/08] | WO2021US26400 | Priority number, date | US202016846670 | 13.04.2020 Original published format: US202016846670 | [2023/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021211354 | Date: | 21.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4136759 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/022, H04B7/15, H04B7/06, H01Q3/44 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
H01Q3/443 (EP,KR);
H01Q3/2676 (KR,US);
H01Q1/246 (KR,US);
H01Q3/26 (US);
H01Q3/2617 (KR,US);
H04B7/0617 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2023/08] | H04B7/022, H04B7/15 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/08] | Title | German: | AUSRICHTBARES STRAHLANTENNENSYSTEM | [2023/08] | English: | AIMABLE BEAM ANTENNA SYSTEM | [2023/08] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ANTENNES À FAISCEAU ORIENTABLE | [2023/08] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 14.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/08] | 24.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2016088648 (XUE FENG [US], et al) | International search | [A]JP2012175189 (SHARP KK); | [A]WO2017193056 (NTT DOCOMO INC [US]); | [A]US2019052428 (CHU LIWEN [US], et al) |