EP4136741 - TORQUE AUGMENTATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Herrin, Robert M. 5935 Groveline Drive Orlando, FL 32810 / US | For all designated states Khant, Sean R. 777 N Ashley Dr. 2302 Tampa, FL 33602 / US | [2023/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2023/08] | Representative(s) | Bewley, Ewan Stuart InCompass IP Europe Limited 51 Paddock Mead Harlow, Essex CM18 7RR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/08] | inCompass IP Europe Limited 51 Paddock Mead Harlow, Essex CM18 7RR / GB | Application number, filing date | 21788565.6 | 13.04.2021 | [2023/08] | WO2021US27037 | Priority number, date | US202016847739 | 14.04.2020 Original published format: US202016847739 | [2023/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021211545 | Date: | 21.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4136741 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H02K49/10, H02K53/00 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
H02K53/00 (EP);
H02K41/06 (KR,US);
H02K49/102 (EP,US);
H02K16/00 (KR);
H02K49/108 (KR);
H02K7/1004 (KR);
H02K7/118 (KR);
H02K7/20 (KR);
H02N11/006 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2023/08] | H02K49/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/08] | Title | German: | DREHMOMENTVERSTÄRKUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/08] | English: | TORQUE AUGMENTATION DEVICE | [2023/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AUGMENTATION DE COUPLE | [2023/08] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4196365 (PRESLEY DOY [US]); | [A]US4486176 (TARDIEU PIERRE R [FR], et al); | [A]JPS61180569 (OMI HIROAKI) | International search | [A]US2007007835 (WISE RICHARD J [CA]) |