EP4135616 - PRE-OPERATIVE SURGICAL PLANNING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cochlear Limited 1 University Avenue Macquarie University, New South Wales 2109 / AU | [2023/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMBAULT, Antonin 1 University Avenue Macquarie University New South Wales 2109 / AU | 02 /
FIERENS, Guy 1 University Avenue Macquarie University New South Wales 2109 / AU | [2023/08] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/08] | Application number, filing date | 21788591.2 | 30.03.2021 | [2023/08] | WO2021IB52623 | Priority number, date | US202063009093P | 13.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063009093 P | [2023/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021209847 | Date: | 21.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4135616 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61B34/10, A61F11/00 | [2023/08] | CPC: |
G06T19/20 (EP);
A61B34/10 (EP,US);
G16H50/50 (EP);
H04R25/606 (EP,US);
A61B2034/104 (EP,US);
A61B2034/105 (EP,US);
A61B2034/107 (US);
A61B90/361 (EP);
A61F11/20 (EP);
G06T2210/41 (EP);
G06T2219/2004 (EP);
G16H20/40 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/08] | Title | German: | PRÄOPERATIVE CHIRURGISCHE PLANUNG | [2023/08] | English: | PRE-OPERATIVE SURGICAL PLANNING | [2023/08] | French: | PLANIFICATION CHIRURGICALE PRÉOPÉRATOIRE | [2023/08] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/08] | 02.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002138115 (BAUMANN JOACHIM W [DE], et al); | [XI]US6748093 (TOEPHOLM JAN [DK]); | [XAI]WO2018200450 (UNIV VANDERBILT [US]) | International search | [A]WO2012040355 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US], et al) [A] 1-37* whole document *; | [A]US2014228909 (DHANASINGH ANANDHAN [AT], et al) [A] 1-37 * whole document *; | [A]US9572981 (NOBLE JACK H [US], et al) [A] 1-37 * whole document *; | [A]WO2018200450 (UNIV VANDERBILT [US]) [A] 1-37 * paragraphs [0020], [0205]-[0250], [0266]; claims 1-61; figures 1-25 *; | [A]US2019240488 (TSAY ISHAN ANN [US], et al) [A] 1-37 * whole document * |