EP4137598 - STEEL MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2023/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONDO, Keiichi c/o NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION, 6-1, Marunouchi 2- chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 02 /
ARAI, Yuji c/o NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION, 6-1, Marunouchi 2- chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 03 /
NAKAMURA, Keiichi c/o NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION, 6-1, Marunouchi 2- chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 04 /
OE, Taro c/o NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION, 6-1, Marunouchi 2- chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 05 /
KURAMOTO, Takenori c/o NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION, 6-1, Marunouchi 2- chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 06 /
TAKEDA, Yosuke c/o NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION, 6-1, Marunouchi 2- chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 07 /
KAMITANI, Hiroki c/o NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION, 6-1, Marunouchi 2- chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2023/08] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2023/08] | Application number, filing date | 21788859.3 | 15.04.2021 | [2023/08] | WO2021JP15628 | Priority number, date | JP20200073017 | 15.04.2020 Original published format: JP 2020073017 | [2023/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021210655 | Date: | 21.10.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4137598 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/00, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/06, C22C38/20, C22C38/22, C22C38/24, C22C38/26, C22C38/28, C22C38/32, C22C38/42, C22C38/44, C22C38/46, C22C38/48, C22C38/50, C22C38/54, C21D8/10, // C21D1/18, C21D1/26, C21D7/13, C21D9/08 | [2023/37] | CPC: |
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/54 (EP,US);
C21D9/08 (EP,US);
C22C38/001 (US);
C22C38/002 (EP,US);
C22C38/005 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,US);
C22C38/20 (EP);
C22C38/22 (EP);
C22C38/24 (EP);
C22C38/26 (EP);
C22C38/28 (EP);
C22C38/32 (EP);
C22C38/42 (EP,US);
C22C38/44 (EP,US);
C22C38/46 (EP,US);
C22C38/48 (EP,US);
C22C38/50 (EP,US);
C21D1/18 (EP);
C21D1/26 (EP);
C21D2211/001 (US);
C21D2211/008 (EP);
C21D7/13 (EP);
C21D8/105 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/08] | C22C38/00, C22C38/54, C21D8/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/08] | Title | German: | STAHLMATERIAL | [2023/08] | English: | STEEL MATERIAL | [2023/08] | French: | MATÉRIAU D'ACIER | [2023/08] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2022 | Translation filed | 27.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 27.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/08] | 29.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS58224116 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003178111 (NAKAMURA SHIGERU [JP], et al) [A] 1-4* the whole document *; | [IA]JP2018168425 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP) [I] 1,3,4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0024] , [0 49] , [0 53] , [0 54] * [A] 2 | International search | [A]JPS58224116 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO) [A] 1-4; | [A]JP2000017389 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [A] 1-4 * claims, paragraph [0026] *; | [A]JP2003041341 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [A] 1-4; | [A]JP2006037147 (SUMITOMO METAL IND)[A] 1-4; | [AX]JP2018168425 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP) [A] 2 [X] 1, 3-4 | by applicant | JP2017002369 |