EP4067185 - VEHICLE DRIVE CONTROL METHOD AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Great Wall Motor Company Limited No. 2266 Chaoyang South St. Baoding, Hebei 071000 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/40] | For all designated states Great Wall Motor Company Limited No.2266 Chaoyang South St. Baoding, Hebei 071000 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Yunfei No. 2266 South of Chaoyang Road Baoding, Hebei 071000 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Qilin No. 2266 South of Chaoyang Road Baoding, Hebei 071000 / CN | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 21789334.6 | 16.04.2021 | [2022/40] | WO2021CN87906 | Priority number, date | CN202010307158 | 17.04.2020 Original published format: CN202010307158 | [2022/40] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021209054 | Date: | 21.10.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4067185 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60W20/20, B60W20/10, B60K6/442, B60K6/547, B60W10/06, B60W10/08, B60W10/11, B60W20/30, B60W50/00 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
B60K6/442 (EP);
B60W20/20 (EP,CN,US);
B60W10/06 (EP,CN,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,CN,US);
B60W10/11 (EP);
B60W20/10 (EP,CN,US);
B60W20/30 (EP);
B60W2510/0638 (EP,US);
B60W2510/0657 (EP);
B60W2510/0666 (US);
B60W2510/081 (EP);
B60W2510/083 (EP);
B60W2510/085 (EP);
B60W2510/1005 (EP);
B60W2510/24 (US);
B60W2520/10 (EP);
B60W2540/10 (EP);
B60W2710/0644 (EP,CN);
B60W2710/0666 (EP,CN,US);
B60W2710/081 (EP);
B60W2710/083 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/40] | B60W20/20, B60W20/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGANTRIEBSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND -SYSTEM | [2022/40] | English: | VEHICLE DRIVE CONTROL METHOD AND SYSTEM | [2022/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE CONDUITE DE VÉHICULE | [2022/40] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2022 | Translation filed | 27.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 27.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 09.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US8433465 (YAMAZAKI MARK S [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,9-11* claims 1-4,9-12,17-19 *; | [X]US2014195092 (SAITO JUN [JP]) [X] 1-3,7-11 * paragraphs [0045] - [0052]; figures 3,4 *; | [X]DE102015222690 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,9-11 * paragraphs [0063] - [0072]; figures 3,5 *; | [X]JP2018134942 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV) [X] 1-3,9-11 * paragraphs [0035] - [0041] *; | [X]CN109353330 (CHONGQING CHANGAN AUTOMOBILE CO LTD) [X] 1-3,9-11 * claims 1-6 *; | [X]US2019126908 (YOKOTA ATSUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,7,9-11 * claims 1-5,8 *; | [X]US10279673 (TSUKIZAKI ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,9-11 * column 11, line 12 - column 14, line 10; figures 5,6 * | International search | [X]CN102275497 (FORD GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC.) [X] 1, 9-11 * description, paragraphs [0018]-[0090], and figures 1-7 *; | [A]CN105730447 (BEIQI FOTON MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * entire document *; | [A]CN107539309 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * entire document *; | [A]JP2018001869 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-11* entire document *; | [X]CN109353330 (CHONGQING CHANGAN AUTOMOBILE CO LTD) [X] 1-11 * description, paragraphs [0043]-[0086], and figures 1-3 *; | [X]CN109720334 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1, 9-11 * description, paragraphs [0068]-[0160], and figures 1-7 * |