EP4229330 - A MULTIFUNCTIONAL LUMINAIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] | 22.12.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Signify Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 48 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2023/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN BOMMEL, Ties 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
PET, Robert, Jacob 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2023/34] | Representative(s) | Verweij, Petronella Daniëlle Signify Netherlands B.V. Intellectual Property High Tech Campus 7 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2023/34] | Application number, filing date | 21790146.1 | 08.10.2021 | [2023/34] | WO2021EP77823 | Priority number, date | EP20200201943 | 15.10.2020 Original published format: EP 20201943 | [2023/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022078882 | Date: | 21.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4229330 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F21S8/06, A61L9/20, F21V7/10, F21V33/00, F21Y113/10, F21Y115/10 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
F21S8/06 (EP,US);
A61L9/20 (EP,US);
F21V33/0064 (EP,US);
F21V7/0033 (US);
F21V7/10 (EP,US);
A61L2209/111 (EP,US);
A61L2209/12 (EP,US);
F21Y2113/10 (EP,US);
F21Y2113/30 (US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/34] | Title | German: | MULTIFUNKTIONSLEUCHTE | [2023/34] | English: | A MULTIFUNCTIONAL LUMINAIRE | [2023/34] | French: | LUMINAIRE MULTIFONCTIONNEL | [2023/34] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/34] | 15.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2007053188 (NEW RICHARD D [US], et al) [A] 1,7,8,12,13 * paragraphs [0035] - [0039] - [0 52] * * claim 1 * * figure 7 *; | [A]KR20150024717 (SEOUL VIOSYS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-3,5,6,8,12,13 * paragraphs [0032] , [0 38] * * figures 1, 2 *; | [A]KR101535242B (YL CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-3,7,8 * paragraphs [0014] , [0 25] , [0 33] , [0 34] * * figures 2a, 2b, 3a, 3b *; | [A]CN108506829 (SUZHOU ZHONGMAN PREC MACHINERY CO LTD) [A] 1-3,5,6 * figures 1, 2 *; | [A]US2019292315 (NIEMIEC DARRIN [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0093] , [0 94] , [0 96] ** figures 16B, 17 *; | [A]EP3660385 (SEOUL VIOSYS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1,2,7-9 * paragraphs [0054] , [ 108] , [ 116] - [0118] * * figures 11b, 13 * |