EP4237305 - METHOD AND CONTROL DEVICE FOR THE SITUATION-DEPENDENT DETERMINATION OF OBSERVATION AREAS FOR MOTOR VEHICLES OPERATED IN AN AT LEAST PARTIALLY AUTONOMOUS MANNER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.05.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | 05.01.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLKSWAGEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | [2023/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MERFELS, Christian 38102 Braunschweig / DE | 02 /
DERENDARZ, Wojciech Waclaw 38106 Braunschweig / DE | 03 /
LAST, Carsten 38102 Braunschweig / DE | [2023/36] | Application number, filing date | 21790423.4 | 08.10.2021 | [2023/36] | WO2021EP77799 | Priority number, date | DE202010213514 | 28.10.2020 Original published format: DE102020213514 | [2023/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022089913 | Date: | 05.05.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4237305 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60W60/00, B60W30/09, B60W30/095, B60W40/04 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
B60W60/0015 (EP,US);
B60W30/0953 (EP);
B60W30/0956 (EP);
B60W40/04 (EP);
B60W2510/0638 (US);
B60W2520/10 (EP);
B60W2552/05 (EP);
B60W2552/45 (EP);
B60W2555/60 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND STEUERGERÄT ZUR SITUATIONSABHÄNGIGEN FESTLEGUNG VON BEOBACHTUNGSBEREICHEN FÜR ZUMINDEST TEILAUTONOM BETRIEBENE KRAFTFAHRZEUGE | [2023/36] | English: | METHOD AND CONTROL DEVICE FOR THE SITUATION-DEPENDENT DETERMINATION OF OBSERVATION AREAS FOR MOTOR VEHICLES OPERATED IN AN AT LEAST PARTIALLY AUTONOMOUS MANNER | [2023/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE POUR LA DÉTERMINATION, EN FONCTION DE LA SITUATION, DE ZONES D'OBSERVATION POUR DES VÉHICULES À MOTEUR FONCTIONNANT DE MANIÈRE AU MOINS PARTIELLEMENT AUTONOME | [2023/36] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/36] | 30.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]DE102005051805 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [Y] 7 * paragraph [0024]; figure 2 * [A] 8,9; | [X]US2019088125 (PARK SUHO [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,10 * paragraphs [0039] , [ 295] , [ 300] , [ 308] , [ 357] - [0375]; figures 7, 16A, 16B *; | [A]WO2019181708 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,10 * figure 6 *; | [XAYI]EP3428028 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1,10 * figures 7, 10-15 * * paragraphs [0049] , [ 100] , [ 103] , [0247] - [0253] - [ 256] , [ 269] , [ 282] , [ 283] , [ 298] , [ 336] * [A] 3,8,9 [Y] 7 [I] 4-6; | [P]DE112019001511T (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [P] * paragraphs [0021] , [0029] , [0031]; figure 6 * | by applicant | DE102016100737 |