EP4245010 - MERKLE PROOF ENTITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states nChain Licensing AG Grafenauweg 6 6300 Zug / CH | [2023/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Wei London W1W 8AP / GB | 02 /
AMMAR, Bassem London W1W 8AP / GB | 03 /
DAVIES, Jack, Owen London W1W 8AP / GB | 04 /
WRIGHT, Craig, Steven London W1W 8AP / GB | [2023/38] | Representative(s) | Page White Farrer Bedford House 21a John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [2023/38] | Application number, filing date | 21790483.8 | 12.10.2021 | [2023/38] | WO2021EP78213 | Priority number, date | GB20200017731 | 10.11.2020 Original published format: GB 202017731 | [2023/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022100946 | Date: | 19.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4245010 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/32 | [2023/38] | CPC: |
H04L9/3239 (EP,KR);
H04L9/3247 (EP,KR);
G06F16/2455 (GB,KR);
G06F16/27 (US);
G06F16/2272 (US);
H04L9/50 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] | Title | German: | MERKLE-PROOF-ENTITÄT | [2023/38] | English: | MERKLE PROOF ENTITY | [2023/38] | French: | ENTITÉ DE PREUVE DE MERKLE | [2023/38] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/38] | 13.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2020165676 (NCHAIN HOLDINGS LTD [AG]) [A] 1-30 * abstract * * page 1, line 4 - page 36, line 25 ** figures 1-12 *; | [XI] - ALIN TOMESCU ET AL, "Catena: Preventing Lies with Bitcoin", IACR, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR CRYPTOLOGIC RESEARCH, (20161113), vol. 20161115:150307, pages 1 - 17, XP061022070 [X] 1,4,6,14,15,19,23,24,29,30 * the whole document * [I] 2,3,5,7-13,16-18,20-22,25-28 |