EP4208853 - FULLY INTEGRATED DIGITAL COLOR MANAGEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] | 10.11.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sun Chemical Corporation 35 Waterview Boulevard Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US | [2023/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCISCIOLI, Felice Maidstone Road Sidcup Kent DA14 5AE / GB | 02 /
RICH, Danny Carlstadt, New Jersey 07072 / US | 03 /
HAYDEN, Richard Yate, SO, BS37 7AA / GB | 04 /
LACHMANN, Joachim 3172 Niederwangen BE / CH | 05 /
KLAUS, Kurt 3172 Niederwangen BE / CH | 06 /
ZNAMENSKAYA, Olga 3172 Niederwangen BE / CH | 07 /
HAURI, Rainer 3172 Niederwangen BE / CH | [2023/28] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2023/28] | Application number, filing date | 21790654.4 | 02.09.2021 | [2023/28] | WO2021US48813 | Priority number, date | US202063074614P | 04.09.2020 Original published format: US 202063074614 P | US202163161581P | 16.03.2021 Original published format: US 202163161581 P | US202163190903P | 20.05.2021 Original published format: US 202163190903 P | [2023/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022051461 | Date: | 10.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4208853 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06T11/00 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
G06T11/001 (EP);
H04N1/54 (US);
B41F33/0045 (US);
G06T17/00 (US);
H04N1/6019 (US);
H04N5/265 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/28] | Title | German: | VOLLINTEGRIERTES DIGITALES FARBMANAGEMENTSYSTEM | [2023/28] | English: | FULLY INTEGRATED DIGITAL COLOR MANAGEMENT SYSTEM | [2023/28] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GESTION NUMÉRIQUE DE COULEURS ENTIÈREMENT INTÉGRÉ | [2023/28] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/28] | 29.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2015023487 (SUN CHEMICAL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [Y]WO2018165667 (DIGIMARC CORP [US]) [Y] 1,4-6 * abstract * * page 16, line 16 - line 24 * * page 28, line 22 * * page 29, line 14 - line 27 * * page 30, line 21 - page 31, line 13 * * figure 4 *; | [Y] - Samadzadegan Sepideh, "Printing Beyond Color: Spectral and Specular Reproduction", (20160205), pages 1 - 163, URL: https://tuprints.ulb.tu-darmstadt.de/5261/1/Diss_for_Publication.pdf, (20211217), XP055874250 [Y] 1,4-6 * page 104 - page 105 * * page 110 * | by applicant | JPS5758367B | JPS604075B | US5929998 | CA2334048 | EP1209630 | US2002163640 | JP2003294530 | US6804390 | JP2005326389 | WO2006013320 | DE60117905T | US2007003691 | US7167246 | WO2007096402 | JP3996677B | WO2007149299 | US2008094638 | US7417764 | WO2008103405 | JP2008540089 | EP2036047 | JP2009527752 | EP2130013 | US7738149 | JP4623842B | WO2013049796 | CN103278459 | US9019514 | EP3048589 | US9404858 | WO2016159758 | NL1041256 | US2017176254 | EP3184990 | WO2018041727 | EP3368872 | US2019078936 | WO2019113606 | EP3500830 | US10508208 | US10613727 | - D.C. RICHV. LOVELLR. MARCUST. KREUTZ, "Modeling the Appearance of Metal-like Packaging Printing", Color Research & Application, (20170000), vol. 42, no. 1, pages 38 - 49 |