EP4233421 - NR SIDELINK ASSISTANCE INFORMATION MESSAGES PROCEDURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.04.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] | 22.12.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SELVANESAN, Sarun 10587 Berlin / DE | 02 /
GÖKTEPE, Baris 10587 Berlin / DE | 03 /
FEHRENBACH, Thomas 10587 Berlin / DE | 04 /
WIRTH, Thomas 10587 Berlin / DE | 05 /
SCHIERL, Thomas 10587 Berlin / DE | 06 /
HELLGE, Cornelius 10587 Berlin / DE | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 21790860.7 | 12.10.2021 | [2023/35] | WO2021EP78125 | Priority number, date | EP20200203155 | 21.10.2020 Original published format: EP 20203155 | [2023/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022084097 | Date: | 28.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4233421 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/02 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
H04W72/02 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/25 (KR);
H04W72/53 (US);
H04W4/06 (KR);
H04W4/40 (KR);
H04W64/00 (KR);
H04W72/51 (KR);
H04W72/542 (EP,KR);
H04W72/56 (KR);
H04W92/18 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] | Title | German: | NR-SIDELINK-UNTERSTÜTZUNGSINFORMATIONSNACHRICHTENVERFAHREN | [2023/35] | English: | NR SIDELINK ASSISTANCE INFORMATION MESSAGES PROCEDURES | [2023/35] | French: | PROCÉDURES DE MESSAGES D'INFORMATIONS D'ASSISTANCE DE LIAISON LATÉRALE NR | [2023/35] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | 17.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2020036422 (LI MING-CHE [TW], et al); | by applicant | EP20200164706 | EP20200197035 | EP20200199880 |