EP4214234 - ANTIGEN-BINDING MOLECULES THAT BIND CD38 AND/OR CD28, AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | [2023/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DILILLO, David Tarrytown, New York 10591 / US | 02 /
HERMANN, Aynur Tarrytown, New York 10591 / US | 03 /
KIRSHNER, Jessica Tarrytown, New York 10591 / US | 04 /
OLSON, Kara Tarrytown, New York 10591 / US | 05 /
SINESHCHEKOVA, Olga Tarrytown, New York 10591 / US | 06 /
SMITH, Eric Tarrytown, New York 10591 / US | 07 /
ULLMAN, Erica Tarrytown, New York 10591 / US | [2023/30] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/30] | Application number, filing date | 21791138.7 | 17.09.2021 | [2023/30] | WO2021US50850 | Priority number, date | US202063080172P | 18.09.2020 Original published format: US 202063080172 P | [2023/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022061098 | Date: | 24.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4214234 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61P35/00 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
C07K16/2896 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/3955 (IL,US);
A61K45/06 (IL,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K16/2809 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K16/2818 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K16/2878 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K16/2887 (IL,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K2039/507 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/545 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K2317/21 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K2317/24 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K2317/31 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/33 (IL,US);
C07K2317/565 (IL,US);
C07K2317/73 (EP,IL,US);
C07K2317/75 (EP,IL,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/30] | Validation states | KH | 03.03.2023 | MA | 03.03.2023 | MD | 03.03.2023 | TN | 03.03.2023 | Title | German: | ANTIGENBINDENDE MOLEKÜLE ZUR BINDUNG VON CD38 UND/ODER CD28 UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2023/30] | English: | ANTIGEN-BINDING MOLECULES THAT BIND CD38 AND/OR CD28, AND USES THEREOF | [2023/30] | French: | MOLÉCULES DE LIAISON À L'ANTIGÈNE SE LIANT À CD38 ET/OU CD28 ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2023/30] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/30] | 03.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2018083204 (ENGMAB SARL [CH]) [A] 1-37,40-70 * page 4, line 18 - line 22 * * page 5, line 11 - page 6, line 30 * * page 7, line 34 - page 8, line 8 * * page 31, line 30 - page 32, line 6; figure 21 * * page 34, line 3 - line 10 ** example 21 *; | [I]WO2019074973 (SANOFI SA [FR], et al) [I] 1-37,40-70 * paragraphs [0006] - [0012] - [0015] - [0019] - [ 134] - [0150]; tables G,H,I,J * * paragraphs [0155] - [0159] - [ 165] , [0195] - [0218]; examples 1-15 *; | [XI]US2019389951 (MURPHY ANDREW J [US], et al) [X] 46-54,56-60,62-70 * paragraphs [0009] - [0015] - [0029] - [0037] - [0136] - [0138] * * paragraphs [0159] - [0168] - [0201] - [0202] * * paragraphs [0216] , [ 217] , [0221] - [0223]; examples 1-13; tables 1,2; sequences 10, 18, 42, 58, 66,81,83 * [I] 1-37,40-45,55,61; | [XI]US2020199234 (GEORGES GUY [DE], et al) [X] 1-13,40-44,47-54,56-60,62-70 * paragraphs [0005] , [0 13] - [0019] - [0060] , [0 62] , [0 63] , [0 87] - [0090] - [ 148] , [ 149] , [0151] - [0153]; figures 37B, 37C,38-40 * * paragraphs [0204] , [0205] , [0207] , [0226] - [0240] - [0356] - [0364] * * paragraphs [0509] - [0529] - [0568] , [0642] - [0663] * * paragraphs [0693] , [0700] - [0713] - [ 718] - [0739] - [ 745] - [0748]; examples 16,17; table 38 * [I] 14-37,45,46,55,61; | [XI]US2020199233 (MURPHY ANDREW J [US], et al) [X] 46-54,56-60,62-70 * paragraphs [0003] , [0008] - [0018] - [0029] - [0035]; sequences 42, 34, 18,10 * * paragraphs [0079] - [0086] - [0090] - [0092] - [0097] - [0111] * * paragraphs [0119] , [0120] - [0128] - [0163] , [0180] - [0185]; examples 1-4, 7-11; tables 3,4 * [I] 1-37,40-45,55,61; | [I] - LAN WU ET AL, "Trispecific antibodies enhance the therapeutic efficacy of tumor-directed T cells through T cell receptor co-stimulation", NATURE CANCER, (20191118), vol. 1, no. 1, doi:10.1038/s43018-019-0004-z, pages 86 - 98, XP055716458 [I] 1-37,40-70 * the whole document; in particular figure 1, discussion * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s43018-019-0004-z | by applicant | US5500362 | US5821337 | US2007280945 | US2011195454 | US8586713 | US2014243504 | US9657102 | US9987500 | US2020024356 | - HOWARD et al., "Formation and hydrolysis of cyclic ADP-ribose catalyzed by lymphocyte antigen CD38", Science, (19930000), vol. 262, pages 1056 - 9 | - CAGNETTA et al., "Intracellular NAD(+) depletion enhances bortezomib-induced anti-myeloma activity", Blood, (20130000), vol. 122, pages 1243 - 55 | - CHILLEMI et al., "Roles and modalities of ectonucleotidases in remodeling the multiple myeloma niche", Front Immunol, (20170000), vol. 8, page 305 | - ATTARWALA, "TGN1412: From Discovery to Disaster", J Young Pharm, (20100000), vol. 2, no. 3, doi:10.4103/0975-1483.66810, pages 332 - 6, XP055407473 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4103/0975-1483.66810 | - SHIELD et al., JBC, (20020000), vol. 277, page 26733 | - "NCBI", Database accession no. NP 001766.2 | - CLYNES et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. (USA, vol. 95, pages 652 - 656 | - TAYLOR et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19920000), vol. 20, pages 6287 - 6295 | - ANGAL et al., Molecular Immunology, (19930000), vol. 30, page 105 | - PEARSON, Methods Mol. Biol., (19940000), vol. 24, pages 307 - 331 | - GONNET et al., Science, (19920000), vol. 256, pages 1443 - 1445 | - ALTSCHUL, J. Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - ALTSCHUL et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19970000), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 402 | - BENEDICT, CA, J Immunol Methods, (19970000), vol. 201, no. 2, pages 223 - 31 | - GEUIJEN, CA et al., J Immunol Methods, (20050000), vol. 302, no. 1-2, pages 68 - 77 | - TUTT et al., J. Immunol., (19910000), vol. 147, pages 60 - 69 | - KUFER et al., Trends Biotechnol, (20040000), vol. 22, pages 238 - 244 | - KLEIN et al., mAbs, (20120000), vol. 4, no. 6, pages 1 - 11 | - REINEKE, Methods Mol Biol, (20040000), vol. 248, pages 443 - 463 | - TOMER, Protein Science, (20000000), vol. 9, pages 487 - 496 | - EHRING, Analytical Biochemistry, (19990000), vol. 267, no. 2, pages 252 - 259 | - ENGENSMITH, Anal. Chem., (20010000), vol. 73, pages 256A - 265A | - JUNGHANS et al., Cancer Res., (19900000), vol. 50, pages 1495 - 1502 | - POWELL et al., "Compendium of excipients for parenteral formulations", J Pharm Sci Technol, (19980000), vol. 52, pages 238 - 311, XP009119027 | - MORDENTI et al., Pharmaceut. Res., (19910000), vol. 8, page 1351 | - WU et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19870000), vol. 262, pages 4429 - 4432 | - GOODSON, Medical Applications of Controlled Release, (19840000), vol. 2, pages 115 - 138 | - LANGER, Science, (19900000), vol. 249, pages 1527 - 1533 | - TAVARE, R et al., Cancer Res., (20160101), vol. 76, no. 1, pages 73 - 82 | - AZAD, BB et al., Oncotarget, (20160315), vol. 7, no. 11, pages 12344 - 58 | - MARTIN et al., "A 44 kilodalton cell surface homodimer regulates interleukin 2 production by activated human T lymphocytes", Journal of immunology, (19860000), vol. 136, no. 9, pages 3282 - 7 | - JUNE et al., "T-cell proliferation involving the CD28 pathway is associated with cyclosporine-resistant interleukin 2 gene expression", Molecular and cellular biology, (19870000), vol. 7, no. 12, pages 4472 - 81 | - HARDING et al., "CD28-mediated signalling co-stimulates murine T cells and prevents induction of anergy in T-cell clones", Nature, (19920000), vol. 356, no. 6370, doi:10.1038/356607a0, pages 607 - 9, XP001152937 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/356607a0 | - ZOUCHEN, "Inhibitory B7-family molecules in the tumor microenvironment", Nature Reviews Immunology, (20080000), vol. 8, doi:10.1038/nri2326, pages 467 - 477, XP009142446 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nri2326 | - FRANCISCO et al., "The PD-1 pathway in tolerance and autoimmunity", Immunol Rev, (20100000), vol. 236, doi:10.1111/j.1600-065X.2010.00923.x, pages 219 - 242, XP002616816 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1600-065X.2010.00923.x | - HUI et al., "T cell costimulatory receptor CD28 is a primary target for PD-1-mediated inhibition", Science, (20170000), vol. 355, no. 6332, pages 1428 - 33 |