EP4211904 - WEARABLE AUDIO DEVICE WITHIN A DISTRIBUTED AUDIO PLAYBACK SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sonos, Inc. 301 Coromar Dr. Goleta, CA 93117 / US | [2024/30] |
Former [2023/29] | For all designated states Sonos Inc. 614 Chapala Street Santa Barbara, CA 93101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELHOUME, Alexia Santa Barbara CA 93101 / US | 02 /
ROBERTS, Brian Santa Barbara CA 93101 / US | 03 /
DOLMAN, Elizabeth Santa Barbara CA 93101 / US | 04 /
MCDEVITT, Jennifer Santa Barbara CA 93101 / US | 05 /
LEID, Deirdre Santa Barbara CA 93101 / US | 06 /
JACKSON, Richard Santa Barbara CA 93101 / US | 07 /
FINK, Scott Santa Barbara CA 93101 / US | 08 /
GOSSAIN, Hrishikesh Santa Barbara CA 93101 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2023/29] | 01 /
DELHOUME, Alexia / US | ||
02 /
ROBERTS, Brian / US | |||
03 /
DOLMAN, Elizabeth / US | |||
04 /
MCDEVITT, Jennifer / US | |||
05 /
LEID, Deirdre / US | |||
06 /
JACKSON, Richard / US | |||
07 /
FINK, Scott / US | |||
08 /
GOSSAIN, Hrishikesh / US | Representative(s) | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [2023/29] | Application number, filing date | 21791516.4 | 09.09.2021 | [2023/29] | WO2021US49662 | Priority number, date | US202063076342P | 09.09.2020 Original published format: US 202063076342 P | US202062706853P | 14.09.2020 Original published format: US 202062706853 P | US202063082273P | 23.09.2020 Original published format: US 202063082273 P | US202063198049P | 25.09.2020 Original published format: US 202063198049 P | [2023/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022056126 | Date: | 17.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4211904 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
H04R25/43 (EP);
H04R3/12 (US);
G06F3/165 (EP);
H04B7/2662 (EP,US);
H04N21/42203 (EP);
H04N21/43076 (EP);
H04N21/43615 (US);
H04N21/4394 (EP);
H04N21/44227 (EP);
H04N21/4532 (EP);
H04N21/4622 (EP);
H04N21/4852 (EP);
H04N21/8106 (EP);
H04R25/407 (US);
H04R25/554 (EP);
H04R29/005 (EP);
H04S7/308 (US);
G06F3/167 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/29] | Title | German: | TRAGBARE AUDIOVORRICHTUNG IN EINEM VERTEILTEN AUDIOWIEDERGABESYSTEM | [2023/29] | English: | WEARABLE AUDIO DEVICE WITHIN A DISTRIBUTED AUDIO PLAYBACK SYSTEM | [2023/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF AUDIO POUVANT ÊTRE PORTÉ PAR L'UTILISATEUR À L'INTÉRIEUR D'UN SYSTÈME DE LECTURE AUDIO DISTRIBUÉ | [2023/29] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/29] | 11.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2011142268 (IWAKUNI KAORU [JP], et al) [X] 1-14,16,17,22,24,25,27-35,39-46,51 * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0087]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0090] * * paragraph [0167] - paragraph [0168]; figure 17 * [I] 15,18-21,23,36-38; | [A]EP2301263 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 23* paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0041]; figure 1 *; | [XI]EP2835986 (OTICON AS [DK]) [X] 1-5,8-12,16 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025]; figures 2, 3 * [I] 6,7,15,17-21,24 | by applicant | US8234395 | US8483853 | US2017242653 | US2018107446 |