EP4135730 - NOVEL ANHYDROUS COMPOSITIONS COMPRISED OF MARINE OILS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 22.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omeza Holdings, Inc. 25 S. Osprey Avenue Sarasota, FL 34236 / US | [2023/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BETTLE, III, Griscom 1660 Stone Ridge Terrace Sarasota, Florida 34232 / US | 02 /
INMAN, Michael C. c/o OMEZA, LLC 25 S. Osprey Avenue Sarasota, Florida 34236 / US | 03 /
KITLOWSKI, Sarah M. c/o OMEZA, LLC 25 S. Osprey Avenue Sarasota, Florida 34236 / US | [2023/08] | Representative(s) | Stepney, Gregory John Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/08] | Jaeger, Michael David Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 21792056.0 | 20.04.2021 | [2023/08] | WO2021US28056 | Priority number, date | US202063013167P | 21.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063013167 P | [2023/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021216480 | Date: | 28.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4135730 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/60, A61K36/889, A61K38/39 | [2023/08] | CPC: |
A61K35/60 (EP,US);
A61K31/202 (US);
A61K31/14 (US);
A61K31/167 (US);
A61K31/23 (EP,US);
A61K31/60 (US);
A61K36/185 (EP,US);
A61K36/889 (US);
A61K38/39 (EP,US);
A61K47/44 (EP);
A61K8/042 (US);
A61K8/361 (US);
A61K8/37 (US);
A61K8/375 (US);
A61K8/65 (US);
A61K8/922 (US);
A61K8/925 (US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K9/06 (EP,US);
A61P17/02 (US);
A61P17/06 (US);
A61P17/10 (US);
A61P27/04 (US);
A61Q19/007 (US);
A61K2800/5922 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/23, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/185, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/39, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/08] | Title | German: | NEUE WASSERFREIE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUS MEERESÖLEN | [2023/08] | English: | NOVEL ANHYDROUS COMPOSITIONS COMPRISED OF MARINE OILS | [2023/08] | French: | NOUVELLES COMPOSITIONS ANHYDRES CONSTITUÉES D'HUILES MARINES | [2023/08] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 14.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/08] | 22.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US4678808 (WARD MICHAEL V [US], et al) [A] 1-6, 54-57, 91, 99-105 * , entire document *; | [A]US2010074963 (BETTLE GRISCOM [US]) [A] 1-6, 54-57, 91, 99-105* , entire document *; | [A]US2017281689 (BETTLE III GRISCOM [US]) [A] 1-6, 54-57, 91, 99-105 * , entire document *; | [A]US2018311120 (BULSARA PALLAV ARVIND [US], et al) [A] 1-6, 54-57, 91, 99-105 * , entire document *; | [X]WO2019200364 (OMEZA LLC [US]) [X] 1-6, 54-57, 91, 99-105 * , abstract, para[0390], para[0021]-para[0022], para[0481], para[0488]-para[0489], para[0011]-para[0012], para[0069], para[0028],para[0037], para[0465]-para[0475] * |