EP4075411 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING INTERACTIVE AUDIENCE SIMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/42] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DASGUPTA, Sumantra Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | 02 /
VERMA, Abhishek Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | 03 /
GUPTA, Sachin Kumar Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | 04 /
GOYAL, Agam Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | [2022/42] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2022/42] | Application number, filing date | 21792242.6 | 20.04.2021 | [2022/42] | WO2021KR04968 | Priority number, date | IN202011017660 | 24.04.2020 Original published format: IN202011017660 | [2022/42] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021215804 | Date: | 28.10.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4075411 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G09B19/04, G09B9/00, G10L15/26 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
G06F40/35 (EP);
G06Q50/10 (KR);
G09B19/04 (EP,US);
G06F40/12 (KR);
G06F40/166 (KR);
G06F40/279 (EP,US);
G06F40/30 (US);
G06F40/40 (US);
G06Q50/20 (EP);
G09B19/00 (EP);
G09B5/06 (EP);
G09B7/02 (EP,US);
G10L13/02 (US);
G10L15/1815 (US);
G10L15/22 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR INTERAKTIVEN ZUSCHAUERSIMULATION | [2022/42] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING INTERACTIVE AUDIENCE SIMULATION | [2022/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE FOURNITURE DE SIMULATION DE PUBLIC INTERACTIVE | [2022/42] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2022 | Translation filed | 15.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/42] | 12.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]KR20150044495 ; | [Y]US2018225131 (TOMMY ROBIN [IN], et al); | [A]WO2019017922 (INTEL CORP [US]); | [YA]KR20190038900 (MAGIC LEAP INC [US]); | [Y]US2019392730 (GUPTA ANINDYA [US], et al) |