EP4142431 - TERMINAL AND COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | 27.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | 27.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2023/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIOKA, Shohei c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. SANNO PARK TOWER, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
NAGATA, Satoshi c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. SANNO PARK TOWER, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2023/09] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/09] | Application number, filing date | 21792403.4 | 26.03.2021 | [2023/09] | WO2021JP13110 | Priority number, date | JP20200076211 | 22.04.2020 Original published format: JP 2020076211 | [2023/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021215195 | Date: | 28.10.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4142431 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W92/18, H04W4/46, H04W28/18, H04L5/00, H04L27/00 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
H04L27/0008 (EP);
H04W28/18 (US);
H04L1/0003 (EP,US);
H04L1/0009 (EP,US);
H04L1/0016 (EP);
H04L1/0023 (EP);
H04L27/3488 (US);
H04L5/0044 (EP);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/09] | H04W92/18, H04W4/46, H04W28/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] | Title | German: | ENDGERÄT UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN | [2023/09] | English: | TERMINAL AND COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2023/09] | French: | TERMINAL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION | [2023/09] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2022 | Translation filed | 25.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/09] | 20.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2020031357 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]); | EP3836500 [ ] (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]); | International search | [XA]US2018324010 (GULATI KAPIL [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6 * [0039]-[0067], 2-7 * [A] 4,5; | [A]WO2019084931 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD [CN]) [A] 1-6 * 2 30-3 19, 6 13-7 4, 19 7-14 12, 18 15-20 3, 20 20-31, 21 18-22 *; | [A]US2020053835 (YE CHUNXUAN [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * [0111]-[0112], [0150]-[0165] *; | [A]US2020106547 (WU SHUANSHUAN [US], et al) [A] 4,5 * [0043]-[0079], 3-5 *; | [A] - Qualcomm Incorporated, "Considerations on Physical Layer aspects of NR V2X", 3GPP Draft; R1-1911104_Considerations on Physical Layer aspects of NR V2X, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20191008), vol. RAN WG1, no. Chongqing, China; 20191014 - 20191020, XP051809280 [A] 1-6 * 2.4 (2.4 Modulation and transmission modes (PSCCH/PSSCH)) * | by applicant | JP2020076211 |