EP4140494 - COMPOSITION FOR PREVENTING OR TREATING LIPID-RELATED METABOLIC DISEASES, COMPRISING LACTOBACILLUS PLANTARUM ATG-K2 OR ATG-K6 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atogen Co., Ltd. 201, 11-8, Techno 1-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34015 / KR | [2023/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Hae-Jeung 103-604, 239, Jeongjail-ro Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13556 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Eun-Jung 102-504, 220, Wirye-daero Hanam-si Gyeonggi-do 13012 / KR | 03 /
KANG, Ji-Hee 103-1103, 15, Songgang-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34010 / KR | 04 /
BAEK, Hyun-Guh 521-1202, 105, Doum 1-ro Sejong-si 30064 / KR | 05 /
PARK, Gun-Seok 101-503, 15, Songgang-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34010 / KR | [2023/09] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2023/09] | Application number, filing date | 21792617.9 | 29.01.2021 | [2023/09] | WO2021KR01255 | Priority number, date | KR20200048174 | 21.04.2020 Original published format: KR 20200048174 | [2023/09] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021215627 | Date: | 28.10.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4140494 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/747, A61P3/06, A61P3/04, A61P1/16, A23L33/135 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
A23L33/135 (EP,KR,US);
A61K35/747 (EP,KR,US);
A23L33/40 (US);
A61P1/16 (KR,US);
A61P3/04 (KR,US);
A61P3/06 (KR,US);
A23V2002/00 (EP,KR);
A23V2200/3262 (KR);
A23V2200/332 (KR);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/3262, A23V2200/332, A23V2400/169 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR PRÄVENTION ODER BEHANDLUNG VON LIPIDBEDINGTEN STOFFWECHSELERKRANKUNGEN MIT LACTOBACILLUS PLANTARUM ATG-K2 ODER ATG-K6 | [2023/09] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR PREVENTING OR TREATING LIPID-RELATED METABOLIC DISEASES, COMPRISING LACTOBACILLUS PLANTARUM ATG-K2 OR ATG-K6 | [2023/09] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR LA PRÉVENTION OU LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES MÉTABOLIQUES LIÉES AUX LIPIDES, COMPRENANT LACTOBACILLUS PLANTARUM ATG-K2 OU ATG-K6 | [2023/09] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2022 | Translation filed | 20.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 20.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/09] | 02.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/31] | 26.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - PARK EUN-JUNG ET AL, "Beneficial Effects of Lactobacillus plantarum Strains on Non-Alcoholic Fatty Liver Disease in High Fat/High Fructose Diet-Fed Rats", NUTRIENTS, (20200220), vol. 12, no. 2, doi:10.3390/nu12020542, page 542, XP055859913 [X] 1-11 * Abstract, page 2, lines 34-46 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/nu12020542 | International search | [X]KR20180040899 (UNIV KONKUK IND COOP CORP [KR], et al) [X] 1-11 * See abstract; and claims 1-3. *; | [X]KR20190051771 (KOREA FOOD RES INST [KR]) [X] 1-11 * See abstract; and claims 1-11. *; | [X]KR20190068025 (VEGUT [KR]) [X] 1-11* See abstract; and claims 1-3. *; | [X]KR102011883B (CKD BIO CORPORATION et al.) [X] 1-11 * See abstract; and claim 1. *; | [X] - Park Eun-Jung, Lee You-Suk, Kim Sung Min, Park Gun-Seok, Lee Yong Hyun, Jeong Do Yeun, Kang Jihee, Lee Hae-Jeung, "Beneficial Effects of Lactobacillus plantarum Strains on Non-Alcoholic Fatty Liver Disease in High Fat/High Fructose Diet-Fed Rats", Nutrients, vol. 12, no. 2, doi:10.3390/nu12020542, page 542, XP055859913 [X] 1-11 * disease in high fat/high fructose diet-fed rats. Nutrients. 20 February 2020, vol. 12, thesis no.: 542, * * pp. 1-16. * * See abstract; and pages 1 and 12-13. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/nu12020542 | by applicant | KR101930438B |