EP4138801 - METHODS FOR TREATING MILD TRAUMATIC BRAIN INJURY, POST TRAUMATIC STRESS DISORDER AND MILD TRAUMATIC BRAIN INJURY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lobe Sciences Ltd. 1199 West Hastings Street, Suite 1400 Vancouver, British Columbia V6E 3T5 / CA | [2023/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DARIANI, Maghsoud 11 Byron Lane Fanwood, NJ 07023 / US | 02 /
PIONTKOWSKI, Shlomo 160 E. 65th Street, Apartment 32c New York, NY 10065 / US | [2023/09] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/09] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | Application number, filing date | 21792649.2 | 20.04.2021 | [2023/09] | WO2021US28068 | Priority number, date | US202063012435P | 20.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063012435 P | US202063016455P | 28.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063016455 P | US202063059272P | 31.07.2020 Original published format: US 202063059272 P | [2023/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021216489 | Date: | 28.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4138801 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/137, A61K31/135, A61K31/167, A61K31/198, A61K31/4045, A61K31/48, A61K31/675, A61P25/00, A61M11/00, A61M15/00, A61M15/08, A61M21/00 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
A61M15/08 (EP,US);
A61K31/198 (EP,US);
A61K31/137 (EP);
A61K31/4045 (EP);
A61K31/48 (EP);
A61K31/675 (EP,US);
A61M11/005 (EP);
A61M11/007 (EP,US);
A61M15/0003 (EP,US);
A61M15/0066 (EP,US);
A61M15/0085 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/26 (US);
A61M2021/0016 (EP);
A61M2202/0468 (EP);
A61M2205/103 (EP);
A61M2205/18 (EP);
A61M2205/502 (EP);
A61M2205/581 (EP);
A61M2205/583 (EP);
A61M2205/6072 (EP);
A61M2205/8206 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/137, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/198, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/4045, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/48, A61K2300/00 (EP); |
Former IPC [2023/09] | A61K31/135, A61K31/167, A61K31/198, A61P25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON LEICHTEN TRAUMATISCHEN HIRNVERLETZUNGEN, POSTTRAUMATISCHEN BELASTUNGSSTÖRUNGEN UND LEICHTEN TRAUMATISCHEN HIRNVERLETZUNGEN | [2023/09] | English: | METHODS FOR TREATING MILD TRAUMATIC BRAIN INJURY, POST TRAUMATIC STRESS DISORDER AND MILD TRAUMATIC BRAIN INJURY | [2023/09] | French: | MÉTHODES DE TRAITEMENT D'UNE LÉSION CÉRÉBRALE TRAUMATIQUE LÉGÈRE, D'UN TROUBLE DE STRESS POST-TRAUMATIQUE ET D'UNE LÉSION CÉRÉBRALE TRAUMATIQUE LÉGÈRE | [2023/09] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/09] | 01.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2021257500 (LOBE SCIENCES LTD [CA]); | International search | [A]US2009216183 (MINOTTI AMERICO MICHAEL [US]); | [A]US2016067196 (CHARNEY DENNIS S [US], et al); | [A]US2018042936 (LOMBARD JAY [US]); | [A]US2018064153 (HOFFMAN JAY R [US]); |