EP4128794 - TRANSFORM SKIP RESIDUAL CODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 17.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEIJING BYTEDANCE NETWORK TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. Room B-0035, 2/F, No.3 Building No. 30, Shixing Road Shijingshan District Beijing 100041 / CN | For all designated states ByteDance Inc. 12655 West Jefferson Boulevard Sixth Floor, Suite No. 137 Los Angeles, CA 90066 / US | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Ye-Kui 12655 West Jefferson Boulevard Sixth Floor, Suite 137 Los Angeles, California 90066 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Li 12655 West Jefferson Boulevard Sixth Floor, Suite 137 Los Angeles, California 90066 / US | 03 /
ZHANG, Kai 12655 West Jefferson Boulevard Sixth Floor, Suite 137 Los Angeles, California 90066 / US | 04 /
DENG, Zhipin Jinritoutiao Post Office China Satellite Communications Tower 63, Zhichun Road, Haidian District Beijing 100080 / CN | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21792750.8 | 19.04.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021CN88056 | Priority number, date | WO2020CN85489 | 19.04.2020 Original published format: PCT/CN2020/085489 | [2023/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021213309 | Date: | 28.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4128794 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/70, H04N19/60, // H04N19/33, H04N19/59, H04N19/597 | [2023/37] | CPC: |
H04N19/70 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/46 (KR,US);
H04N19/124 (KR);
H04N19/174 (US);
H04N19/176 (KR,US);
H04N19/33 (EP,KR);
H04N19/52 (KR);
H04N19/59 (EP,KR);
H04N19/60 (EP);
H04N19/597 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/06] | H04N19/70 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | RESTCODIERUNG VON TRANSFORMATIONSÜBERSPRINGUNGEN | [2023/06] | English: | TRANSFORM SKIP RESIDUAL CODING | [2023/06] | French: | CODAGE RÉSIDUEL À OMISSION DE TRANSFORMÉE | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 03.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 17.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN107071494 (ZHUHAI JIELI TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [A]CN107439015 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG); | [A]WO2018207956 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]WO2019004888 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [A]CN110944195 (BEIJING BYTEDANCE NETWORK TECH CO LTD, et al) |