EP4132082 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING SIGNALS IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HWANG, June 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
JIN, Seungri 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21792820.9 | 23.04.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021KR05189 | Priority number, date | KR20200050318 | 24.04.2020 Original published format: KR 20200050318 | [2023/06] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021215884 | Date: | 28.10.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4132082 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/16, H04L5/00, // H04W24/10 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
H04L5/005 (EP);
H04W24/10 (EP,KR,US);
H04W24/08 (US);
H04L5/0094 (EP);
H04W48/16 (EP);
H04W56/001 (KR);
H04W84/047 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/06] | H04W24/10, H04W56/00, H04W84/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SENDEN UND EMPFANGEN VON SIGNALEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2023/06] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING SIGNALS IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2023/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION ET DE RÉCEPTION DE SIGNAUX DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2022 | Translation filed | 25.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 12.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2019319748 (NAM WOOSEOK [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [XP]US2020374735 (WEI LILI [US], et al) [XP] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0091] - [0111] *; | [XI] - SAMSUNG, "[S020],[S021] SMTC occasion calculation for smtc3 for IAB-MT", vol. RAN WG2, no. Online Meeting ;20200420 - 20200430, (20200410), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-2003728, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_109bis-e/Docs/R2-2003728.zip R2-2003728 smtc3 operation TP.docx, (20200410), XP051871615 [X] 1,5,8,12 * the whole document * [I] 2-4,6,7,9-11,13-15 | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; NR; Radio Resource Control (RRC) protocol specification (Release 15)", vol. RAN WG2, no. V15.9.0, (20200331), pages 1 - 536, 3GPP STANDARD; TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION; 3GPP TS 38.331, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: ftp://ftp.3gpp.org/Specs/archive/38_series/38.331/38331-f90.zip 38331-f90.docx, (20200331), XP051861366 [A] 1-15 * pages 91-92, 205, 383-385 * | International search | [A]US2019306734 (HUANG DINHWA [TW], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0117]-[0121]; and figure 9. *; | [A]US2019313271 (YIU CANDY [US]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0168] and [0310]-[0315]; and figures 7-8. *; | [A]US2019319748 (NAM WOOSEOK [US], et al) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0067]-[0105]; and figures 4-5. *; | [Y]KR20200033744 (ELECTRONICS & TELECOMMUNICATIONS RES INST [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0102] and [0180]; and figure 20. *; | [Y] - Samsung, "[S020],[S021] SMTC occasion calculation for smtc3 for IAB-MT", 3GPP Draft; R2-2003728, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), (20200410), XP051871615 [Y] 1-15 * See section 4. * |