EP4141343 - WATER HEATING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 10.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qingdao Haier Air-Conditioning Electronic Co., Ltd Haier Industrial Park No. 1 Haier Road Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | For all designated states Haier Smart Home Co., Ltd. Haier Industrial Park No. 1 Haier Road Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | [2023/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Baoku Haier Industrial Park No.1 Haier Road Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | 02 /
HAN, Weitao Haier Industrial Park No.1 Haier Road Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | 03 /
HAN, Yefei Haier Industrial Park No.1 Haier Road Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | 04 /
MAO, Shoubo Haier Industrial Park No.1 Haier Road Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | 05 /
WANG, Chungang Haier Industrial Park No.1 Haier Road Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | [2023/09] | Representative(s) | Budde Schou A/S Dronningens Tvaergade 30 1302 Copenhagen K / DK | [2023/09] | Application number, filing date | 21793723.4 | 04.02.2021 | [2023/09] | WO2021CN75275 | Priority number, date | CN202010327616 | 23.04.2020 Original published format: CN202010327616 | [2023/09] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021212962 | Date: | 28.10.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4141343 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F24H4/02, F24H9/20, F24D15/04, F24H4/04, F24H15/215, F24H15/219, F24H15/223, F24H15/248, F24D17/02, F24D17/00, F24H15/315, F24H15/32, F24H15/335, F25B47/02 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
F24D17/02 (EP);
F24H4/02 (CN);
F24D17/0031 (EP);
F24H15/215 (EP);
F24H15/219 (EP);
F24H15/223 (EP);
F24H15/248 (EP);
F24H15/315 (EP);
F24H15/32 (EP);
F24H15/335 (EP);
F24H4/04 (EP);
F24H9/0005 (CN);
F24H9/2007 (CN);
F25B47/02 (EP,CN);
F24D2200/123 (EP);
F24D2220/0235 (EP);
F24D2220/042 (EP);
F24D2220/048 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/09] | F24H4/02, F24H9/20, F24D15/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] | Title | German: | WASSERERHITZEREINHEIT | [2023/09] | English: | WATER HEATING UNIT | [2023/09] | French: | UNITÉ DE CHAUFFAGE D'EAU | [2023/09] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2022 | Translation filed | 30.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2022 | Examination requested [2023/09] | 10.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN101424451 (ZHEJIANG ZHENGLI ELECTRONIC & [CN]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [XI]CN102445027 (GUANGDONG EUROKLIMAT AIR COND) [X] 1,3,9,10 * the whole document * [I] 2,4-8; | [X]EP2713112 (CORSETTI CARLO [IT]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0028]; figure 3 *; | [A]US9163855 (AKEL DOMINIQUE [FR]) [A] 8 * claim 1 *; | [A]CN107687707 (DAI YAO) [A] 1* the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2005024242 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO, et al) [A] 1-10* entire document *; | [A]EP2434231 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [Y]CN104633925 (GUANDONG MIDEA HVAC EQUIPMENT, et al) [Y] 1-10 * description, specific embodiments, and figures 1-4 *; | [Y]CN104964431 (WUHU MINGREN HEAT ENERGY EQUIPMENT CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * description, pages 1-2, and figure 1 *; | [A]CN204987463U (EXTEK ENERGY EQUIPMENT (ZHEJIANG) LTD) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [Y]CN105466034 (GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES INC ZHUHAI) [Y] 1-10 * description, specific embodiments, and figures 1-3 *; | [A]CN107687707 (DAI YAO) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [Y]CN108375101 (UNIV TIANJIN) [Y] 1-10 * description, pages 3-5, and figure 1 *; | [PX]CN111609552 (QINGDAO HAIER AIR CONDITIONER ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al) [PX] 1-10 * claims 1-10 *; | [PX]CN111609561 (QINGDAO HAIER AIR CONDITIONER ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al) [PX] 1-10 * description, specific embodiments, and figures 1-2 * | by applicant | CN105626903 | CN205780896U | CN108019938 | CN208651635U |