EP4260625 - SINGLE FREQUENCY FULL-DUPLEX RESOURCE MANAGEMENT METHODS FOR V2X SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | 16.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALASUBRAMANIAN, Anantharaman San Diego, California 92121 / US | 02 /
GULATI, Kapil San Diego, California 92121 / US | 03 /
WU, Shuanshuan San Diego, California 92121 / US | 04 /
ABEDINI, Navid San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2023/42] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [2023/42] | Application number, filing date | 21795201.9 | 28.09.2021 | [2023/42] | WO2021US52470 | Priority number, date | US202017120022 | 11.12.2020 Original published format: US202017120022 | [2023/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022125169 | Date: | 16.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4260625 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/02, H04W24/00 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
H04W72/02 (EP,US);
H04B17/318 (US);
H04L5/14 (US);
H04W24/10 (US);
H04W28/26 (US);
H04W4/40 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/42] | Title | German: | EINZELFREQUENZ-VOLLDUPLEX-RESSOURCENVERWALTUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR V2X-SYSTEME | [2023/42] | English: | SINGLE FREQUENCY FULL-DUPLEX RESOURCE MANAGEMENT METHODS FOR V2X SYSTEMS | [2023/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE GESTION DES RESSOURCES EN DUPLEX INTÉGRAL À FRÉQUENCE UNIQUE POUR SYSTÈMES V2X | [2023/42] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/42] | 31.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP3550905 (IDAC HOLDINGS INC [US]) [X] 1-30 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0153] - paragraph [0154] * * paragraph [0167] * * claim 10 *; | [X]WO2020173536 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al) [X] 1-30 * page 1, line 5 - page 14, line 13 * * page 17, line 12 - page 18, line 2 * * figure 3 *; | [X]US2020351828 (LEE SEUNGMIN [KR], et al) [X] 1-30 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0162] * * figure 8 * * claim 15 *; | [X] - INTERDIGITAL INC, "Mode 2a and Mode 2d for NR V2X Resource Allocation", vol. RAN WG1, no. Taipei, Taiwan; 20190121 - 20190125, (20190112), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1900769 (R16 V2X WI AI72414 RESOURCE ALLOCATION), 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5FAH/NR%5FAH%5F1901/Docs/R1%2D1900769%2Ezip, (20190112), XP051576307 [X] 1-30 * paragraph [2.2.2] * * paragraph [06.2] - paragraph [06.3] * |