EP4143681 - COARSE-GRAIN RECONFIGURABLE ARRAY PROCESSOR WITH CONCURRENT HANDLING OF MULTIPLE GRAPHS ON A SINGLE GRID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 07.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Speedata Ltd. Matam Park, building no. 6 P.O. Box 15006 31905 Haifa / IL | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ETSION, Yoav 3030000 Atlit / IL | 02 /
VOITSECHOV, Dani 3030000 Atlit / IL | 03 /
KRIMER, Evgeni 3542001 Haifa / IL | 04 /
FRIEDMANN, Jonathan 4053260 Even Yehuda / IL | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 21795366.0 | 14.03.2021 | [2023/10] | WO2021IB52105 | Priority number, date | US202016860070 | 28.04.2020 Original published format: US202016860070 | US202016889159 | 01.06.2020 Original published format: US202016889159 | [2023/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021220067 | Date: | 04.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4143681 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 04.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/38, G06F9/48, G06F15/78, G06F15/82, // G06F13/40 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
G06F13/4027 (EP,US);
G06F9/3836 (US);
G06F15/7867 (EP);
G06F15/825 (EP);
G06F9/4881 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/10] | G06F9/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] | Title | German: | GROBKÖRNIGER REKONFIGURIERBARER ARRAY-PROZESSOR MIT GLEICHZEITIGER VERARBEITUNG MEHRERER GRAPHEN AUF EINEM EINZIGEN GITTER | [2023/10] | English: | COARSE-GRAIN RECONFIGURABLE ARRAY PROCESSOR WITH CONCURRENT HANDLING OF MULTIPLE GRAPHS ON A SINGLE GRID | [2023/10] | French: | PROCESSEUR VECTORIEL RECONFIGURABLE À GROS GRAIN AVEC TRAITEMENT SIMULTANÉ DE MULTIPLES GRAPHES SUR UNE GRILLE UNIQUE | [2023/10] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 04.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2022 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 07.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2015268963 (ETSION YOAV [IL], et al) | International search | [A]US2017046138 (STANFILL CRAIG W [US], et al); | [A]US2018101387 (ETSION YOAV [IL], et al); | [XA]US2019004878 (ADLER MICHAEL C [US], et al); | [A]US2019102179 (FLEMING KERMIN E [US], et al) | by applicant | US2018101387 |