EP4096803 - FILTER INTERCONNECT USING A MAGNETIC SHEAR FORCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | 12.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KX Technologies LLC 55 Railroad Avenue West Haven, CT 06516 / US | [2022/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASTLE, Robert Middlefield, CT 06455 / US | 02 /
HARTMANN, Matthew, W. Evansville, IN 47715 / US | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2022/49] | Application number, filing date | 21795919.6 | 27.04.2021 | [2022/49] | WO2021US29302 | Priority number, date | US202063015840P | 27.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063015840 P | [2022/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021222177 | Date: | 04.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4096803 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B01D27/08, B01D25/00, B01D27/00, B01D35/06, B01D35/30, H01F7/02 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
B01D29/96 (EP,GB,IL,KR);
B01D35/30 (IL,US);
B01D35/147 (EP,GB,IL,KR,US);
B01D35/1573 (EP,GB,IL,KR,US);
B01D35/306 (KR);
B01D2201/29 (IL,KR,US);
B01D2201/302 (EP,GB,IL,KR,US);
B01D2201/4015 (EP,GB,IL,KR);
B01D2201/4053 (EP,GB,IL,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/49] | B01D27/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/49] | Title | German: | FILTERVERBINDUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER MAGNETISCHEN SCHERKRAFT | [2022/49] | English: | FILTER INTERCONNECT USING A MAGNETIC SHEAR FORCE | [2022/49] | French: | INTERCONNEXION DE FILTRE UTILISANT UNE FORCE DE CISAILLEMENT MAGNÉTIQUE | [2022/49] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 01.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/49] | 02.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US7893803 (FULLERTON LARRY W [US], et al); | [A]US2017259196 (FOIX LORI [US], et al); | [Y]US2019039005 (SUTHAR NARESH [IN], et al); | [A]US2019351354 (CHANDRA SHARATH [IN], et al); | [XYA]US2020001211 (LI WILLIAM [US], et al) |