EP4095986 - BATTERY PACK AND DEVICE INCLUDING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANG, Byung Do Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Donghyun Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
CHUN, Yongho Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Hyoungsuk Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/48] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 21796250.5 | 29.04.2021 | [2022/48] | WO2021KR05439 | Priority number, date | KR20200052253 | 29.04.2020 Original published format: KR 20200052253 | KR20210055140 | 28.04.2021 Original published format: KR 20210055140 | [2022/48] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021221478 | Date: | 04.11.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4095986 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/6551, H01M10/6556, H01M10/6567, H01M10/625, H01M10/613, H01M10/42, H01M50/20 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
H01M10/425 (EP,US);
H01M10/6556 (EP,US);
H01M10/482 (EP);
H01M10/486 (EP);
H01M10/613 (EP,US);
H01M10/625 (EP,US);
H01M10/647 (EP,US);
H01M10/6551 (EP,US);
H01M10/6567 (EP);
H01M50/211 (EP,US);
H01M50/505 (US);
H01M2010/4271 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Title | German: | BATTERIEPACK UND VORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2022/48] | English: | BATTERY PACK AND DEVICE INCLUDING SAME | [2022/48] | French: | BLOC-BATTERIE ET DISPOSITIF COMPRENANT CELUI-CI | [2022/48] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2022 | Translation filed | 26.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 26.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012156543 (CICERO MARKE S [US], et al); | [A]US10003112 (BOOR PAUL J [US], et al); | [XI]WO2019046012 (MODINE MFG CO [US]); | [XI]US2019319318 (PARK JUYONG [KR]); | [E]EP4040577 (LG ENERGY SOLUTION LTD [KR]) | International search | [A]KR20170065906 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20180038310 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [Y]CN109962191 (NEXTEV LTD); | [Y]JP2019129042 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]KR20200021608 (SK INNOVATION CO LTD [KR]) |