EP4144817 - ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENCE ELEMENT MATERIAL AND ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENCE ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON STEEL Chemical & Material Co., Ltd. 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKENAGA, Yuji Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | 02 /
KAI, Takahiro Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIDA, Kazunari Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | 04 /
HAYASHI, Kentaro Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 21796332.1 | 16.04.2021 | [2023/10] | WO2021JP15655 | Priority number, date | JP20200080549 | 30.04.2020 Original published format: JP 2020080549 | [2023/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021220838 | Date: | 04.11.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4144817 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, C09K11/06, H10K50/11, H10K85/60, H10K101/00, H10K101/10 | [2024/24] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP);
H10K85/6572 (EP,KR,US);
C09K11/06 (EP);
H10K50/11 (EP,KR);
H10K50/12 (EP,KR,US);
H10K85/622 (US);
H10K85/654 (EP,KR,US);
H10K85/6574 (KR,US);
H10K85/6576 (KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/10] | C09K11/06, C07D487/04, H05B33/10, H01L51/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] | Title | German: | MATERIAL FÜR EIN ORGANISCHES ELEKTROLUMINESZENZELEMENT UND ORGANISCHES ELEKTROLUMINESZENZELEMENT | [2023/10] | English: | ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENCE ELEMENT MATERIAL AND ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENCE ELEMENT | [2023/10] | French: | MATÉRIAU D'ÉLÉMENT À ÉLECTROLUMINESCENCE ORGANIQUE ET ÉLÉMENT À ÉLECTROLUMINESCENCE ORGANIQUE | [2023/10] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2022 | Translation filed | 28.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 02.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]JP2013168649 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD) [X] 1-6, 8, 10-11 * , paragraphs [0118], [0194]-[0201], [0211] * [Y] 7, 9, 12-15; | [Y]US2017194569 (KIM MYEONG-SUK [KR], et al) [Y] 7, 9, 12-15 * , claim 19 *; | [Y]JP2017520904 (ROHM AND HAAS ELECTRONIC MATERIALS KOREA LTD.) [Y] 7, 9, 12-15 * , claim 6 *; | [Y]JP6663427B (NIPPON STEEL CHEMICAL & MATERIAL CO., LTD.) [Y] 9, 12-15* , abstract, paragraphs [0032], [0048], [0072], [0096] * | by applicant | JP2003133075 | WO2008056746 | WO2010134350 | WO2011070963 | WO2011136755 | WO2013062075 | KR20130132226 | US2014197386 | US2014374728 | US2015001488 | WO2016042997 | - J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20010000), vol. 123, page 4304 | - Nature, (20120000), vol. 492, page 234 | - Nature Photonics, (20140000), vol. 8, page 326 | WO2013JP53051 |