EP4143693 - DETECTING AND ASSIGNING ACTION ITEMS TO CONVERSATION PARTICIPANTS IN REAL-TIME AND DETECTING COMPLETION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Outreach Corporation 333 Elliott Ave W, Ste 500 Seattle, WA 98119 / US | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANE, Rohit, Ganpat Seattle, WA 98117 / US | 02 /
ABHISHEK, Abhishek Seattle, WA 98117 / US | 03 /
NAREDDY, Krishnamohan, Reddy Seattle, WA 98117 / US | 04 /
GARG, Rajiv Seattle, WA 98117 / US | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 21796372.7 | 29.04.2021 | [2023/10] | WO2021US29987 | Priority number, date | US202063018898P | 01.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063018898 P | [2023/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021222638 | Date: | 04.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4143693 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/10, G06F15/16, H04L65/40, G06F3/00 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
G06Q10/103 (EP);
G10L15/22 (US);
G10L15/063 (US);
G10L25/51 (US);
G10L15/26 (EP);
G10L17/00 (EP);
H04M3/569 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/10] | G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] | Title | German: | ERKENNUNG UND ZUWEISUNG VON AKTIONSELEMENTEN AN KONVERSATIONSTEILNEHMER IN ECHTZEIT UND ERKENNUNG DER BEENDIGUNG DAVON | [2023/10] | English: | DETECTING AND ASSIGNING ACTION ITEMS TO CONVERSATION PARTICIPANTS IN REAL-TIME AND DETECTING COMPLETION THEREOF | [2023/10] | French: | DÉTECTION ET ATTRIBUTION D'ÉLÉMENTS D'ACTION À DES PARTICIPANTS À UNE CONVERSATION EN TEMPS RÉEL, ET DÉTECTION DE L'ACHÈVEMENT DE CES DERNIERS | [2023/10] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 05.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2017092264 (HAKKANI-TUR DILEK ZEYNEP [US], et al); | [Y]US2019171693 (DOTAN-COHEN DIKLA [IL], et al); | [Y]US2019189117 (KUMAR NAVNEET [IN]); | [A]US10374816 (LEBLANG JONATHAN ALAN [US], et al); | [A]US2019273767 (NELSON STEVEN [US], et al) | International search | [Y]US2017092264 (HAKKANI-TUR DILEK ZEYNEP [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * , entire document, especially Abstract; para [0033], [0063]-[0064] *; | [Y]US2019171693 (DOTAN-COHEN DIKLA [IL], et al) [Y] 9, 19 .* , entire document, especially Abstract; para [0047] *; | [Y]US2019189117 (KUMAR NAVNEET [IN]) [Y] 1-20 * , entire document, especially Abstract; para [0019], [0033], [0035], [0063], [0066] *; | [Y]US10374816 (LEBLANG JONATHAN ALAN [US], et al) [Y] 4, 14 * , entire document, especially Abstract; col 5, In 47-58; col 19, In 55 to col 20, In 7 *; | [Y]US2019273767 (NELSON STEVEN [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * , entire document, especially Abstract; para [0339] » * |