EP4134258 - REFRIGERANT THERMAL MANAGEMENT MODULE, THERMAL MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Digital Power Technologies Co., Ltd. Office 01, 39th Floor, Block A Antuoshan Headquarters Towers 33 Antuoshan 6th Road Futian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518043 / CN | [2023/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Shuliang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Yanzhong Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
LONG, Feng Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Hongji Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/07] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/07] | Huawei European IPR Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21796669.6 | 01.02.2021 | [2023/07] | WO2021CN74631 | Priority number, date | CN202010337532 | 26.04.2020 Original published format: CN202010337532 | [2023/07] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021218263 | Date: | 04.11.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4134258 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B60K11/00, H01M10/613, B60H1/14, B60H1/32, B60L58/26 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
B60H1/32284 (EP);
B60H1/00278 (EP,CN,US);
B60H1/00392 (CN,US);
B60H1/00885 (CN,US);
B60L1/003 (EP);
B60L58/26 (EP,US);
H01M10/613 (EP);
H01M10/615 (EP);
H01M10/625 (EP);
H01M10/6568 (EP);
H01M10/663 (EP);
B60H2001/00307 (EP,CN,US);
B60K11/02 (EP);
B60K2001/005 (EP);
B60K2001/006 (EP);
B60L2240/34 (EP);
B60L2240/36 (EP);
B60L2240/425 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/07] | B60K11/00, H01M10/613, B60H1/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] | Title | German: | KÄLTEMITTELWÄRMEVERWALTUNGSMODUL, WÄRMEVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM UND FAHRZEUG | [2023/07] | English: | REFRIGERANT THERMAL MANAGEMENT MODULE, THERMAL MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND VEHICLE | [2023/07] | French: | MODULE DE GESTION THERMIQUE DE RÉFRIGÉRANT, SYSTÈME DE GESTION THERMIQUE ET VÉHICULE | [2023/07] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2022 | Translation filed | 07.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/07] | 16.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2018208061 (BEN AHMED FAHMI [DE], et al) [X] 1,7,20 * the whole document *; | [X]US10371420 (KATOH YOSHIKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2019158316 (JAGUAR LAND ROVER LTD [GB]) [X] 1,7,20* the whole document * | International search | [A]EP2524829 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-24 * entire document *; | [X]CN205130860U (ANHUI JIANGHUAI AUTOMOBILE CO) [X] 1-24 * description, paragraphs 32-45 and figure 1 *; | [A]JP2017105393 (CALSONIC KANSEI CORP) [A] 1-24* entire document *; | [A]CN207045140U (COTECH AUTOMOTIVE ENG CORP LTD) [A] 1-24 * entire document *; | [Y]CN209592253U (GUANGZHOU AUTOMOBILE GROUP CO) [Y] 5-6 * description, paragraphs 44-75, and figures 1-2 *; | [XY]CN209813715U (BYD CO LTD) [X] 1-4, 7-24 * description, paragraphs 68-77 and figure 3 * [Y] 5-6 |