EP4145556 - NEGATIVE ELECTRODE MATERIAL AND BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MINEYA Kunihiko Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
NAGAMINE Kenta Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 21796715.7 | 12.02.2021 | [2023/10] | WO2021JP05350 | Priority number, date | JP20200079491 | 28.04.2020 Original published format: JP 2020079491 | [2023/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021220580 | Date: | 04.11.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4145556 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/13, H01M4/133, H01M4/134, H01M4/1393, H01M4/1395, H01M4/36, H01M4/587, H01M4/62, H01M10/0562 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
H01M4/36 (EP);
H01M4/62 (EP,US);
H01M10/052 (EP);
H01M10/0525 (EP);
H01M10/0562 (EP,US);
H01M4/13 (EP);
H01M4/133 (EP,US);
H01M4/134 (EP);
H01M4/1393 (EP,US);
H01M4/1395 (EP);
H01M4/366 (EP);
H01M4/382 (EP);
H01M4/5825 (EP);
H01M4/587 (EP,US);
H01M4/625 (EP);
H01M2004/021 (EP,US);
H01M2004/027 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0068 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] | Title | German: | NEGATIVES ELEKTRODENMATERIAL UND BATTERIE | [2023/10] | English: | NEGATIVE ELECTRODE MATERIAL AND BATTERY | [2023/10] | French: | MATÉRIAU D'ÉLECTRODE NÉGATIVE ET BATTERIE | [2023/10] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2022 | Translation filed | 28.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 26.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2015002054 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [A]JP5984014B (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2020058932 (MAEDA KATSUMI [JP]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | International search | [YA]JP2015002054 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO) [Y] 1, 4-12 * claims * [A] 2-3, 13-14; | [XYA]WO2018083937 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 13 * claims, paragraphs [0019], [0090] * [Y] 1, 4-12 [A] 2-3, 14; | [XYA]WO2019235469 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 13 * claims, paragraphs [0013], [0063] * [Y] 1, 4-12[A] 2-3, 14 | by applicant | JP4729716B |