EP4237166 - SENSOR MODULE FOR MONITORING A CLEANING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.05.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | 05.01.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KHS GmbH Juchostraße 20 44143 Dortmund / DE | [2023/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALD, Daniel 59174 Kamen / DE | 02 /
DITTRICH, Falk 44581 Castrop-Rauxel / DE | [2023/36] | Application number, filing date | 21799211.4 | 21.10.2021 | [2023/36] | WO2021EP79167 | Priority number, date | DE202010128719 | 02.11.2020 Original published format: DE102020128719 | [2023/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022090045 | Date: | 05.05.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4237166 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B08B9/20, B08B9/42, B08B13/00 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
B08B9/42 (EP);
B08B13/00 (EP);
B08B9/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/36] | Title | German: | SENSORMODUL ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINER REINIGUNGSMASCHINE | [2023/36] | English: | SENSOR MODULE FOR MONITORING A CLEANING MACHINE | [2023/36] | French: | MODULE CAPTEUR PERMETTANT LA SURVEILLANCE D'UNE MACHINE DE NETTOYAGE | [2023/36] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/36] | 02.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE3424711 (LANG APPARATEBAU GMBH [DE]) [Y] 11 * page 5, line 1 - page 7, line 9 *; | [XYI]DE4237207 (KRONSEDER MASCHF KRONES [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,13-24 * column 1, line 21 - column 3, line 48; figure - * [Y] 4,5,7,9,11 [I] 4,5,8,10,12; | [Y]WO2017028982 (KHS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 4,5 * figure -; claim - *; | [Y]CN207463730U (KUNSHAN HUDA ROBOT TECH CO LTD, et al) [Y] 7,11 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE102017114657 (KHS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 7,9 * paragraphs [0007] - [0016] - [0042] - [0048] - [0052] - [0056]; figure - *; | [A]DE102018102692 (KHS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-24* paragraphs [0004] - [0008] - [0044] , [0074] - [0076]; figure - * |