EP4149072 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING EDGE COMPUTING SERVICE BY USING NETWORK SLICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Jicheol Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Hyesung Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/11] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2023/11] | Application number, filing date | 21799551.3 | 06.05.2021 | [2023/11] | WO2021KR05690 | Priority number, date | KR20200054796 | 07.05.2020 Original published format: KR 20200054796 | [2023/11] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021225389 | Date: | 11.11.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4149072 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L67/289 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
H04L65/1073 (EP);
H04L67/1008 (KR);
H04W48/18 (US);
H04L67/289 (EP,KR);
H04L67/52 (EP,KR);
H04L67/61 (KR);
H04W84/042 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/11] | H04L29/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/11] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINES EDGE-COMPUTING-DIENSTES UNTER VERWENDUNG VON NETZWERK-SLICE | [2023/11] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING EDGE COMPUTING SERVICE BY USING NETWORK SLICE | [2023/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE FOURNIR UN SERVICE INFORMATIQUE EN PÉRIPHÉRIE EN UTILISANT UNE TRANCHE DE RÉSEAU | [2023/11] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2022 | Translation filed | 07.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/11] | 15.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI] - CATT, "Pseudo-CR on solution of initial provisioning with authorization", vol. SA WG6, no. Reno, Nevada, USA; 20191111 - 20191115, (20191104), 3GPP DRAFT; S6-192153 PCR 23758 SOLUTION OF INITIAL PROVISIONING WITH AUTHORIZATION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTI, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_sa/WG6_MissionCritical/TSGS6_034_Reno/docs/S6-192153.zip S6-192153 pCR 23758 solution of initial provisioning with authorization.doc, (20191104), XP051813217 [X] 11,15 * the whole document * [A] 1-10,13,14 [I] 12 | [A] - ERICSSON, "Edge Application Server Discovery and selection using DNS", vol. SA WG2, no. Incheon, Korea; 20200113 - 20200117, (20200107), 3GPP DRAFT; S2-2000196, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_sa/WG2_Arch/TSGS2_136AH_Incheon/Docs/S2-2000196.zip S2-2000196_pCR_DNS_solution.docx, (20200107), XP051842303 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]KR20190132018 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 6-7,13 * See paragraphs [0006]-[0009], [0067]-[0072] and [0129]-[0131]; and figures 3, 9b and 10. *; | [A]US2020120182 (KOTECHA LALIT R [US], et al) [A] 1-15* See claims 1-8. *; | [Y] - Huawei, Hisilicon, "Service provisioning procedures", 3GPP Draft; S6-200505, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20200325), vol. SA WG6, no. E-meeting; 20200331 - 20200408, XP051867751 [Y] 1-9,13-15 | [Y] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; System architecture for the 5G System (5GS); Stage 2 (Release 16)", 3GPP Standard; Technical Specification; 3GPP TS 23.501, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20200327), vol. SA WG2, no. V16.4.0, pages 1 - 430, XP051861090 [Y] 1-9,14-15 * See pages 116-117 and 191-198. * | [A] - Samsung, "Deployment model for different Network Slice implementations", 3GPP Draft; S6-200473, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20200325), vol. SA WG6, no. E-meeting; 20200331 - 20200408, XP051867727 [A] 1-15 * See sections 2 and A.X.1-A.X.2. * |