EP4133713 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR GENERATING AND REMOVING DYNAMIC EAS USING UE APP AND STATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Jicheol Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Hyesung Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/07] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2023/07] | Application number, filing date | 21800173.3 | 07.05.2021 | [2023/07] | WO2021KR05737 | Priority number, date | KR20200055485 | 08.05.2020 Original published format: KR 20200055485 | KR20210054617 | 27.04.2021 Original published format: KR 20210054617 | [2023/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021225406 | Date: | 11.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4133713 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/60 | [2023/37] | CPC: |
H04L67/125 (EP);
H04W24/10 (US);
H04L41/5051 (EP);
H04L43/0817 (EP);
H04L61/4511 (EP,US);
H04L67/10 (EP);
H04L67/52 (US);
H04L41/0897 (EP);
H04L43/0876 (EP);
H04L67/02 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/07] | H04L29/08, H04W4/60, H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG UND ENTFERNUNG VON DYNAMISCHER EAS MITHILFE VON UE-APP UND STATUS | [2023/07] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR GENERATING AND REMOVING DYNAMIC EAS USING UE APP AND STATUS | [2023/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION ET D'ÉLIMINATION D'EAS DYNAMIQUE À L'AIDE D'UNE APPLI ET D'UN ÉTAT D'UE | [2023/07] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 08.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/07] | 14.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2014143428 (ZHENG RUOBIN [CN]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0067]-[0098]; and figures 7-8 *; | [A]WO2017100640 (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0148]; and figure 4 *; | [A]WO2017186260 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al) [A] 1-15 * pages 11-13; and figure 9 *; | [A] - Convida Wireless LLC, Samsung, "EAS discovery based on TR solutions 1 and 13", 3GPP Draft; S6-200242, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20200119), vol. SA WG6, no. Hyderabad, India; 20200113 - 20200117, XP051844465 [A] 4-10,13-15 | [A] - Convida Wireless LLC, Samsung, "EAS discovery based on TR solutions 1 and 13", 3GPP Draft; S6-200242, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20200119), vol. SA WG6, no. Hyderabad, India; 20200113 - 20200117, XP051844465 [A] 1-15 * 3GPP TSG-SA WG6 Meeting #35, Hyderabad, India, 19 January 2020 * * pages 1-3 * |