EP4146185 - AKT3 MODULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Georgiamune Inc. 942 Clopper Road Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | [2023/21] |
Former [2023/11] | For all designated states Georgiamune LLC 942 Clopper Road Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACCOSS, Malcolm Seabrook Island, SC 29455 / US | 02 /
KHLEIF, Samir Bethesda, MD 20816 / US | 03 /
MKRTICHYAN, Mikayel Tujunga, CA 91042 / US | [2023/11] | Representative(s) | Heller, Benjamin Henry, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2023/11] | Application number, filing date | 21800442.2 | 07.05.2021 | [2023/11] | WO2021US31325 | Priority number, date | US202063021987P | 08.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063021987 P | US202063121001P | 03.12.2020 Original published format: US 202063121001 P | [2023/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021226477 | Date: | 11.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4146185 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/14, A61K31/167, A61K31/4709 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K31/4709 (KR);
A61K31/501 (KR);
A61K31/506 (KR);
A61K31/519 (KR);
A61K31/5377 (KR);
A61P25/00 (KR);
A61P27/02 (KR);
A61P29/00 (KR);
A61P3/04 (KR);
A61P35/00 (KR);
A61P35/02 (KR);
A61P37/00 (KR);
C07D213/74 (EP,IL);
C07D215/44 (EP,IL);
C07D401/14 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D413/14 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D471/04 (EP,IL,KR);
|
Former IPC [2023/11] | A61K31/167, A61K31/4709, C07D401/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/11] | Title | German: | AKT3-MODULATOREN | [2023/11] | English: | AKT3 MODULATORS | [2023/11] | French: | MODULATEURS D'AKT3 | [2023/11] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/11] | 22.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2009285772 (PHIASIVONGSA PASIT [US], et al) [A] 1, 3/1, 32-33, 67-68* para [0003], [0294] *; | [A]US2017166555 (JAMES IAN [AU], et al) [A] 1, 3/1, 32-33, 67-68 * para [0005], [0316], Scheme 19; para [0335] *; | [A]US2017202829 (KHLEIF SAMIR N [US], et al) [A] 1, 3/1, 32-33, 67-68 * para [0003], [0057], [0062]; Fig. 7A *; | [A] - Anonymous, "SID 371993578", PUBCHEM, (20180525), Database accession no. 371993578, URL: PUBCHEM Substance, XP055870461 [A] 1, 3/1, 32-33, 67-68 * ; pg 2 * |