EP4148913 - SPRING CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YOKOWO CO., LTD. 5-11, Takinogawa 7-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 114-8515 / JP | [2023/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Kenta Tomioka-Shi, Gunma 370-2495 / JP | 02 /
WATANABE, Yasushi Tokyo 114-8515 / JP | 03 /
ENDO, Kenji Tomioka-Shi, Gunma 370-2495 / JP | [2023/11] | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/11] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21800774.8 | 30.04.2021 | [2023/11] | WO2021JP17237 | Priority number, date | JP20200081785 | 07.05.2020 Original published format: JP 2020081785 | [2023/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021225121 | Date: | 11.11.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4148913 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/48, H01R13/24, F16F1/06 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
H01R13/2421 (EP);
H01R4/4863 (US);
F16F1/06 (EP);
H01R13/2471 (EP);
H01R4/60 (US)
|
Former IPC [2023/11] | H01R4/48, H01R13/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/11] | Title | German: | FEDERVERBINDER | [2023/11] | English: | SPRING CONNECTOR | [2023/11] | French: | CONNECTEUR À RESSORT | [2023/11] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2022 | Translation filed | 27.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 27.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3012491 ; | [XI]US2005280433 (NELSON LARRE H [US], et al); | [X]CN200953400Y (QIAOMENG SPRING CO LTD [CN]); | [X]US2011117796 (OISHI YOSHITAKA [MY]); | [A]JP2012093265 (HIOKI ELECTRIC WORKS); | [X]JP2017526920 | International search | [Y]JPH11162545 (YOKOWO SEISAKUSHO KK) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0008]-[0011], fig. 1 *; | [Y]US2005280433 (NELSON LARRE H [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0050]-[0055], fig. 7A-8D *; | [Y]CN200953400Y (QIAOMENG SPRING CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 1-10 * page 4, line 1 to page 5, line 7, fig. 5 *; | [Y]WO2011058646 (TEST TOOLING SOLUTIONS GROUP PTE LTD [SG], et al) [Y] 9-10* paragraphs [0028]-[0034], fig. 2-6 * |