EP4146817 - LIQUID BIOPSY PLATFORM IN PLASMA AND SALIVA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | For all designated states Strom, Charles 2939 Calle Gaucho San Clemente, CA 92673 / US | For all designated states Liao, Wei 19025 Nashville Street Northridge, CA 91326 / US | For all designated states Tang, Jason The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, Twelfth Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [2023/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WONG, David, T. Beverly Hills, CA 90211 / US | 02 /
WEI, Fang Northridge, CA 91326 / US | 03 /
TU, Michael Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 04 /
CHENG, Jordan Oakland, CA 94607 / US | 05 /
CHIA, David Oakland, CA 94607 / US | 06 /
YE, Qianlin Oakland, CA 90211 / US | 07 /
LI, Feng Oakland, CA 90211 / US | 08 /
STROM, Charles San Clemente, CA 92673 / US | 09 /
LIAO, Wei Northridge, CA 91326 / US | 10 /
TANG, Jason Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [2023/11] | Representative(s) | Duncombe, Jessica, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2023/11] | Application number, filing date | 21800932.2 | 07.05.2021 | [2023/11] | WO2021US31359 | Priority number, date | US202063021172P | 07.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063021172 P | [2023/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2021226501 | Date: | 11.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4146817 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6825, C12Q1/6886 | [2024/25] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
B01L3/5085 (US);
C12Q1/6816 (EP);
C12Q1/6825 (EP);
B01L2300/0645 (US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6816, C12Q2537/143, C12Q2563/131, C12Q2565/519, C12Q2565/607 (EP);
C12Q1/6825, C12Q2537/143, C12Q2563/116, C12Q2563/131, C12Q2565/519 (EP) |
Former IPC [2023/11] | C12Q1/6813, C12Q1/6827, C12Q1/6834 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/11] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGE BIOPSIEPLATTFORM IN PLASMA UND SPEICHEL | [2023/11] | English: | LIQUID BIOPSY PLATFORM IN PLASMA AND SALIVA | [2023/11] | French: | PLATE-FORME DE BIOPSIE LIQUIDE DANS LE PLASMA ET LA SALIVE | [2023/11] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/11] | 22.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6391558 (HENKENS ROBERT W [US], et al); | [X]WO2015187855 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]); | [I]WO2018059576 (GUANGZHOU EZLIFE SCI & TECH CO LTD [CN]) | International search | [Y]US5891630 (EGGERS MITCHELL D [US], et al); | [YA]US2010173285 (VARMUS HAROLD [US], et al); | [A]US2011214206 (LA ROSA THOMAS J [US], et al); | [A]US2012282610 (IGUCHI AKI [JP]); | [Y]US2014194296 (LUO YULING [US], et al); |