EP4150072 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ENHANCING GENE EXPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University Building 170, Third Floor, Main Quad P.O. Box 20386 Stanford, CA 94305-2038 / US | [2023/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARNA, Maria Stanford, CA 94305-2038 / US | 02 /
LEPPEK, Kathrin Stanford, CA 94305-2038 / US | [2023/12] | Representative(s) | Patentanwaltskanzlei Matschnig & Forsthuber OG Biberstraße 22 Postfach 36 1010 Wien / AT | [2023/12] | Application number, filing date | 21803351.2 | 11.05.2021 | [2023/12] | WO2021US31875 | Priority number, date | US202063022898P | 11.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063022898 P | [2023/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021231502 | Date: | 18.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4150072 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/09, C12N15/11, C12N15/113, C12N15/63, C12N15/67, C12Q1/68 | [2023/12] | CPC: |
C12N15/67 (EP,US);
C12N2310/531 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER GENEXPRESSION | [2023/12] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ENHANCING GENE EXPRESSION | [2023/12] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR AMÉLIORER L'EXPRESSION GÉNIQUE | [2023/12] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 22.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/12] | 20.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2016032317 (ROSSI DERRICK [US], et al) [Y] 4,13,25 * entire document *; | [Y]US2018171332 (ANDO YUKIO [JP], et al) [Y] 20-30 * entire document *; | [Y]US2018319854 (GUMMADOVA JENNET ORAZMURADOVNA [GB]) [Y] 19 * entire document *; | [XY] - Xue Shifeng, Tian Siqi, Fujii Kotaro, Kladwang Wipapat, Das Rhiju, Barna Maria, "RNA regulons in Hox 5′ UTRs confer ribosome specificity to gene regulation", Nature, Nature Publishing Group UK, London, London, (20150101), vol. 517, no. 7532, doi:10.1038/nature14010, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 33 - 38, XP055875925 [X] 1-3, 5-12, 14-18 * and Suppl. Pgs. 1-12. entire document * [Y] 4, 13, 19-30 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature14010 | [XP] - Leppek Kathrin; Fujii Kotaro; Quade Nick; Susanto Teodorus Theo; Boehringer Daniel; Lenarčič Tea; Xue Shifeng; Genuth Naomi R.; Ban Nenad; Barna Maria, "Gene- and Species-Specific Hox mRNA Translation by Ribosome Expansion Segments", Molecular Cell, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20201116), vol. 80, no. 6, doi:10.1016/j.molcel.2020.10.023, ISSN 1097-2765, page 980, XP086414327 [XP] 1-30 * . entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molcel.2020.10.023 |