EP4150575 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR IMAGING A SCENE, SUCH AS A MEDICAL SCENE, AND TRACKING OBJECTS WITHIN THE SCENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Proprio, Inc. 111 W. John St. No. 308 Seattle, WA 98119 / US | [2023/34] |
Former [2023/12] | For all designated states Proprio, Inc. 111 W. John St. Suite 308 Seattle, WA 98119 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOUNGQUIST, James, Andrew Seattle, WA 98119 / US | 02 /
COLMENARES, David, Julio Seattle, WA 98119 / US | 03 /
JONES, Adam, Gabriel Seattle, WA 98119 / US | 04 /
NONN, Thomas, Ivan Seattle, WA 98119 / US | 05 /
PETERSON, Jay Seattle, WA 98119 / US | [2023/12] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/12] | Application number, filing date | 21803498.1 | 10.05.2021 | [2023/12] | WO2021US31653 | Priority number, date | US202015930305 | 12.05.2020 Original published format: US202015930305 | [2023/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021231337 | Date: | 18.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4150575 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/292, A61B34/20, A61B90/00, A61B90/50, H04N17/00, H04N23/45, H04N23/56, H04N23/90, H04N23/60, // G01S5/16, G01S5/18, H04N5/222, H04N13/00 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
A61B34/20 (EP,US);
G06T7/292 (EP,US);
A61B90/361 (EP,US);
A61B90/50 (EP,US);
G06T11/00 (US);
G06T7/70 (US);
G06T7/80 (US);
H04N17/002 (EP);
H04N23/45 (EP);
H04N23/54 (US);
H04N23/56 (EP);
H04N23/60 (EP);
H04N23/698 (US);
H04N23/90 (EP,US);
H04N5/2628 (US);
H04N5/265 (US);
A61B2017/00725 (EP);
A61B2034/2057 (EP,US);
A61B2090/061 (EP);
A61B2090/364 (US);
A61B2090/365 (EP);
A61B2090/371 (EP,US);
A61B2090/372 (EP);
G01S5/16 (EP);
G01S5/18 (EP);
G06T2207/10028 (EP);
G06T2207/10048 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/12] | G06T7/292 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR ABBILDUNG EINER SZENE, WIE ETWA EINER MEDIZINISCHEN SZENE, UND VERFOLGUNG VON OBJEKTEN IN DER SZENE | [2023/12] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR IMAGING A SCENE, SUCH AS A MEDICAL SCENE, AND TRACKING OBJECTS WITHIN THE SCENE | [2023/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES D'IMAGERIE D'UNE SCÈNE, TELLE QU'UNE SCÈNE MÉDICALE, ET DE SUIVI D'OBJETS À L'INTÉRIEUR DE LA SCÈNE | [2023/12] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 06.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/12] | 15.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2013076863 (RAPPEL JAMES K [SG]); | [Y]US2016080734 (AGUIRRE-VALENCIA SERGIO [US]); | [Y]US2016352982 (WEAVER JOSHUA [US], et al); | [Y]US2018302572 (BARNES JACOB [US]); | [Y]US2019289284 (SMITH JOSHUA R [US], et al) |